EP2637111 - Data management system and method using database middleware [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.12.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Naver Corporation Greenfactory 6 Buljeong-ro Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 463-867 / KR | [2019/22] |
Former [2014/48] | For all designated states Naver Corporation Greenfactory 6 Buljeong-ro Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 463-867 / KR | ||
Former [2013/37] | For all designated states NHN Business Platform Corp. 9F, First Tower 266-1, Seohyun-dong Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Kyunggi-do 463-824 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, SungKyu c/o NHN Business Platform Corporation 9F, First Tower 266-1, Seohyun-dong Bundang-gu Kyunggi-do Seongnam-si / KR | 02 /
Jun, Wonhee c/o NHN Business Platform Corporation 9F, First Tower 266-1, Seohyun-dong Bundang-gu Kyunggi-do Seongnam-si / KR | 03 /
Nam, Chang Woo c/o NHN Business Platform Corporation 9F, First Tower 266-1, Seohyun-dong Bundang-gu Kyunggi-do Seongnam-si / KR | 04 /
Park, Boosik c/o NHN Business Platform Corporation 9F, First Tower 266-1, Seohyun-dong Bundang-gu Kyunggi-do Seongnam-si / KR | 05 /
Jeong, Kihyo c/o NHN Business Platform Corporation 9F, First Tower 266-1, Seohyun-dong Bundang-gu Kyunggi-do Seongnam-si / KR | [2013/37] | Representative(s) | Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [2019/22] |
Former [2013/37] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 13151082.8 | 11.01.2013 | [2013/37] | Priority number, date | KR20120022434 | 05.03.2012 Original published format: KR 20120022434 | [2013/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2637111 | Date: | 11.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2637111 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2013/37] | CPC: |
G06F16/278 (EP,KR);
G06F16/283 (KR);
G06F3/0608 (KR);
G06F9/44 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/22] |
Former [2013/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Datenverwaltungssystem und Verfahren, das Datenbank-Middleware verwendet | [2013/37] | English: | Data management system and method using database middleware | [2013/37] | French: | Système et procédé de gestion de données au moyen d'un progiciel de base de données | [2013/37] | Examination procedure | 11.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/37] | 11.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 22.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.11.2018 | 20.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 13.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.11.2017 | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.01.2013 | AL | 29.05.2019 | AT | 29.05.2019 | CY | 29.05.2019 | CZ | 29.05.2019 | DK | 29.05.2019 | EE | 29.05.2019 | ES | 29.05.2019 | FI | 29.05.2019 | HR | 29.05.2019 | IT | 29.05.2019 | LT | 29.05.2019 | LV | 29.05.2019 | MC | 29.05.2019 | MK | 29.05.2019 | MT | 29.05.2019 | NL | 29.05.2019 | PL | 29.05.2019 | RO | 29.05.2019 | RS | 29.05.2019 | SE | 29.05.2019 | SI | 29.05.2019 | SK | 29.05.2019 | SM | 29.05.2019 | TR | 29.05.2019 | BG | 29.08.2019 | NO | 29.08.2019 | GR | 30.08.2019 | IS | 29.09.2019 | PT | 30.09.2019 | GB | 11.01.2020 | IE | 11.01.2020 | LU | 11.01.2020 | BE | 31.01.2020 | CH | 31.01.2020 | LI | 31.01.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 11.01.2013 | |
AL | 29.05.2019 | ||
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CY | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
MT | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
IS | 29.09.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
GB | 11.01.2020 | ||
IE | 11.01.2020 | ||
LU | 11.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 11.01.2013 | |
AL | 29.05.2019 | ||
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CY | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
MT | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
GB | 11.01.2020 | ||
IE | 11.01.2020 | ||
LU | 11.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
GB | 11.01.2020 | ||
IE | 11.01.2020 | ||
LU | 11.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
GB | 11.01.2020 | ||
LU | 11.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
GB | 11.01.2020 | ||
LU | 11.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
LU | 11.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
SM | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
IT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
RS | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 29.05.2019 | |
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
HR | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 29.05.2019 | |
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 29.05.2019 | |
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
NO | 29.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2009240664 (DINKER DARPAN [US], et al) [I] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0107] * * paragraph [0149] * * paragraph [0163] - paragraph [0168] *; | [A] - XIN ZHANG ET AL, "Building extensible and high performance distributed transaction service", SOFTWARE ENGINEERING CONFERENCE, 2004. PROCEEDINGS. 2004 AUSTRALIAN MELBOURNE, AUSTRALIA 13-16 APRIL 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20040413), ISBN 978-0-7695-2089-6, pages 202 - 210, XP010698508 [A] 1-11 * abstract * * page 202, column l, line 26 - page 202, column r, line 7 * * page 205, column l, line 10 - page 205, column r, line 27 * * page 207, column l, line 14 - page 207, column l, line 33 * | [A] - "Partition (database) - Wikipedia, the free encyclopedia", (20110923), pages 1 - 3, URL: http://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Partition(database)&oldid0452021987, (20130221), XP055054202 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * |