EP2584065 - Surface metallizing method, method for preparing plastic article and plastic article made therefrom [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BYD Company Limited No. 3009, BYD Road Pingshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518118 / CN | [2013/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gong, Qing No. 3009, BYD Road Pingshan, Longgang 518118 Shenzhen / CN | 02 /
Zhou, Liang No. 3009, BYD Road Pingshan, Longgang 518118 Shenzhen / CN | 03 /
Miao, Weifeng No.3009, BYD Road Pingshan, Longgang 518118 Shenzhen / CN | 04 /
Zhang, Xiong No.3009, BYD Road Pingshan, Longgang 518118 Shenzhen / CN | [2013/17] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/17] | Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 13151235.2 | 22.04.2010 | [2013/17] | Priority number, date | CN20091261216 | 17.12.2009 Original published format: CN200910261216 | CN20091238957 | 30.12.2009 Original published format: CN200910238957 | [2013/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2584065 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2584065 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | [2013/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2584065 | Date: | 16.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C23C18/54, C23C18/20, C23C18/31, C23C18/16, B01J23/00, C08K3/00, C08K3/08, C08K3/18, C08K3/22, C08K3/34, C08K3/38, C08J7/12, B01J37/34, B01J23/80, C23C18/36, C23C18/40, C23C18/18, B01J37/02 | [2013/40] | CPC: |
C23C18/1608 (EP,US);
C23C18/54 (KR);
B01J23/80 (EP,US);
B01J37/34 (EP,US);
B01J37/349 (EP,US);
B32B15/08 (KR);
C23C18/1612 (EP,US);
C23C18/1641 (EP,US);
C23C18/1651 (EP,US);
C23C18/1653 (EP,US);
C23C18/182 (EP,US);
C23C18/204 (EP,US);
C23C18/36 (EP,US);
C23C18/405 (EP,US);
B01J37/0201 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12569 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/18] | C23C18/54, C23C18/20, C23C18/31, C23C18/16, B01J23/00, C08K3/00, C08K3/08, C08K3/18, C08K3/22, C08K3/34, C08K3/38, C08J7/12, B01J37/34, B01J23/80, C23C18/36, C23C18/40, C23C18/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/17] | Title | German: | Oberflächenmetallisierungsverfahren, verfahren zur herstellung eines kunststoffartikels und daraus hergestellter kunststoffartikel | [2014/04] | English: | Surface metallizing method, method for preparing plastic article and plastic article made therefrom | [2013/17] | French: | Procédé de métallisation de surface, procédé de préparation d'un article en plastique et article en plastique réalisé à partir de ce dernier | [2014/04] |
Former [2013/17] | Oberflächenmetallisierungsverfahren, Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Kunststoffartikels und daraus hergestellter Kunststoffartikel | ||
Former [2013/17] | Procédé de métallisation de surface, procédé de préparation d'un article en plastique et article en plastique réalisé à partir de ce dernier | Examination procedure | 15.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/17] | 10.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10827682.5 / EP2379772 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20100827682) is 05.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.04.2010 | AT | 16.04.2014 | BE | 16.04.2014 | CY | 16.04.2014 | CZ | 16.04.2014 | EE | 16.04.2014 | ES | 16.04.2014 | HR | 16.04.2014 | IT | 16.04.2014 | LT | 16.04.2014 | LV | 16.04.2014 | MC | 16.04.2014 | MK | 16.04.2014 | MT | 16.04.2014 | NL | 16.04.2014 | PL | 16.04.2014 | RO | 16.04.2014 | SI | 16.04.2014 | SK | 16.04.2014 | SM | 16.04.2014 | TR | 16.04.2014 | IE | 22.04.2014 | LU | 22.04.2014 | CH | 30.04.2014 | LI | 30.04.2014 | BG | 16.07.2014 | NO | 16.07.2014 | GR | 17.07.2014 | IS | 16.08.2014 | PT | 18.08.2014 | [2018/32] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 22.04.2010 | |
AT | 16.04.2014 | ||
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
MT | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
SM | 16.04.2014 | ||
TR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IE | 22.04.2014 | ||
LU | 22.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 22.04.2010 | |
AT | 16.04.2014 | ||
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
MT | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
SM | 16.04.2014 | ||
IE | 22.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
MT | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
RO | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
SM | 16.04.2014 | ||
IE | 22.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
MT | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
SM | 16.04.2014 | ||
IE | 22.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
MT | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
IE | 22.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SI | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
IE | 22.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
IE | 22.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.04.2014 | ||
EE | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
SK | 16.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
MC | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
BE | 16.04.2014 | ||
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
PT | 18.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 16.04.2014 | |
CY | 16.04.2014 | ||
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
ES | 16.04.2014 | ||
HR | 16.04.2014 | ||
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
LV | 16.04.2014 | ||
NL | 16.04.2014 | ||
PL | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
GR | 17.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
NO | 16.07.2014 | ||
IS | 16.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 16.04.2014 | |
LT | 16.04.2014 | ||
BG | 16.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 16.04.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5422383 (TAKAHASHI JUN [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 26 * * column 5, line 47 - column 6, line 27 *; | [A]US5599592 (LAUDE LUCIEN D [FR]) [A] 1-13 * column 2, line 31 - column 3, line 39 * * examples 1,3,5 * * claims 1,7,9,10,11 *; | [A]US6696173 (NAUNDORF GERHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US6706785 (FU GUOYI [US]) [A] 1-13 * column 1, line 21 - column 2, line 19 ** column 5, line 1 - line 21 *; | [A]US2007247822 (NAUNDORF GERHARD [DE]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0018] * * claims 1-12 *; | [A]US2008015320 (LEE YUEH-LING [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0105] - paragraph [0111] * * claims 50,52 *; | [A]US2009292051 (LI YANJUN FRANK [CN], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0045] * | by applicant | - ACTA PHYSICO-CHIMICA SINICA, (2004), vol. 20, no. 5, pages 524 - 528 | - ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED., (2003), vol. 42, pages 3815 - 3817 |