EP2618595 - Mobile WiFi network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2021 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Comcast Cable Communications, LLC 1701 JFK Boulevard Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US | [2013/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cook, Michael J. c/o Comcast Cable Communications, LLC 1701 JFK Boulevard Philadelphia, PA Pennsylvania 19103 / US | 02 /
Ong, Ivan c/o Comcast Cable Communications, LLC 1701 JFK Boulevard Philadelphia, PA Pennsylvania 19103 / US | [2013/30] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2020/23] |
Former [2013/30] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 13151390.5 | 16.01.2013 | [2013/30] | Priority number, date | US201213351585 | 17.01.2012 Original published format: US201213351585 | [2013/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2618595 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2618595 | Date: | 25.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2618595 | Date: | 03.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/02, H04W16/18, H04W24/02, // H04W84/18 | [2020/01] | CPC: |
H04W4/023 (EP,US);
H04W12/55 (EP);
H04W16/18 (EP,US);
H04W24/02 (EP,US);
H04W4/46 (EP);
H04W4/80 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2013/30] | H04W4/02, H04L12/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/23] |
Former [2013/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Mobiles WiFi-Netzwerk | [2013/30] | English: | Mobile WiFi network | [2013/30] | French: | Réseau wifi mobile | [2013/30] | Examination procedure | 25.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/18] | 28.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 15.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20171344.3 / EP3709681 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.07.2017 | Opposition(s) | 04.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.01.2013 | AL | 03.06.2020 | AT | 03.06.2020 | CY | 03.06.2020 | CZ | 03.06.2020 | DK | 03.06.2020 | EE | 03.06.2020 | ES | 03.06.2020 | FI | 03.06.2020 | HR | 03.06.2020 | IT | 03.06.2020 | LT | 03.06.2020 | LV | 03.06.2020 | MC | 03.06.2020 | MK | 03.06.2020 | NL | 03.06.2020 | PL | 03.06.2020 | RO | 03.06.2020 | RS | 03.06.2020 | SE | 03.06.2020 | SI | 03.06.2020 | SK | 03.06.2020 | SM | 03.06.2020 | BG | 03.09.2020 | NO | 03.09.2020 | GR | 04.09.2020 | IS | 03.10.2020 | PT | 06.10.2020 | IE | 16.01.2021 | LU | 16.01.2021 | BE | 31.01.2021 | CH | 31.01.2021 | LI | 31.01.2021 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/30] | HU | 16.01.2013 | |
AL | 03.06.2020 | ||
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CY | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
IE | 16.01.2021 | ||
LU | 16.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 16.01.2013 | |
AL | 03.06.2020 | ||
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
IE | 16.01.2021 | ||
LU | 16.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
IE | 16.01.2021 | ||
LU | 16.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
IE | 16.01.2021 | ||
LU | 16.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
LU | 16.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
LU | 16.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
AT | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 03.06.2020 | |
NO | 03.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008253386 (BARUM WALTER [US]) [X] 1-12,14,15 * paragraphs [0029] , [0030] , [0036] - [0038] *; | [X]US2011307599 (SARETTO CESARE JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1-12,14,15 * paragraphs [0039] - [0041] *; | [X]US2011320819 (WEBER KARON A [US], et al) [X] 1-12,14,15* pages 40-41,57 * | Examination | US2011009098 | by applicant | US2008253386 | US2011307599 | US2011320819 |