EP2620828 - Vehicle fleet management system and inter vehicle distance control method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.11.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Murata Machinery, Ltd. 3 Minami Ochiai-cho Kisshoin Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 601-8326 / JP | [2013/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nagasawa, Atsuo c/o Murata Machinery, Ltd. Inuyama Plant, 2 Aza-Nakajima, Oaza-Hashizume Inuyama-shi, Aichi 484-8502 / JP | [2017/51] |
Former [2013/31] | 01 /
Nagasawa, Atsuo c/o Murata Machinery, Ltd., Inuyama Plant, 2 Aza-Nakajima, Oaza-Hashizume Inuyama-shi Aichi, 484-8502 / JP | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2017/51] |
Former [2013/31] | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler & Partner P.O. Box 246 82043 Pullach / DE | Application number, filing date | 13151498.6 | 16.01.2013 | [2013/31] | Priority number, date | JP20120015471 | 27.01.2012 Original published format: JP 2012015471 | [2013/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2620828 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2620828 | Date: | 20.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/02, B61L27/00, G05D1/00 | [2017/27] | CPC: |
G05D1/0297 (EP,US);
G05D3/12 (KR);
G05D1/0027 (US);
B61L27/20 (US)
|
Former IPC [2013/31] | G05D1/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/51] |
Former [2013/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Fahrzeugsflotte Managementsystem und Verfahren für die Steuerung der Distanz zwischen Fahrzeuge | [2017/27] | English: | Vehicle fleet management system and inter vehicle distance control method | [2013/31] | French: | Système de gestion de véhicules et procédé de supervision de la distance inter-véhicules | [2013/31] |
Former [2013/31] | Fahrzeugflotten-Managementsystem und Verfahren für die Steuerung der Distanz zwischen Fahrzeugen | Examination procedure | 03.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/03] | 14.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.11.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 13.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.06.2017 | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.01.2013 | AL | 20.12.2017 | AT | 20.12.2017 | CY | 20.12.2017 | CZ | 20.12.2017 | DK | 20.12.2017 | EE | 20.12.2017 | ES | 20.12.2017 | FI | 20.12.2017 | HR | 20.12.2017 | IT | 20.12.2017 | LT | 20.12.2017 | LV | 20.12.2017 | MC | 20.12.2017 | MK | 20.12.2017 | NL | 20.12.2017 | PL | 20.12.2017 | PT | 20.12.2017 | RO | 20.12.2017 | RS | 20.12.2017 | SE | 20.12.2017 | SI | 20.12.2017 | SK | 20.12.2017 | SM | 20.12.2017 | TR | 20.12.2017 | IE | 16.01.2018 | LU | 16.01.2018 | MT | 16.01.2018 | BE | 31.01.2018 | CH | 31.01.2018 | LI | 31.01.2018 | FR | 20.02.2018 | BG | 20.03.2018 | GB | 20.03.2018 | NO | 20.03.2018 | GR | 21.03.2018 | IS | 20.04.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 16.01.2013 | |
AT | 20.12.2017 | ||
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
MK | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PT | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
TR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IE | 16.01.2018 | ||
LU | 16.01.2018 | ||
MT | 16.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 20.02.2018 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
GB | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 16.01.2013 | |
AT | 20.12.2017 | ||
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PT | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
TR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IE | 16.01.2018 | ||
LU | 16.01.2018 | ||
MT | 16.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 20.02.2018 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
GB | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
TR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IE | 16.01.2018 | ||
LU | 16.01.2018 | ||
MT | 16.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 20.02.2018 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
GB | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
IE | 16.01.2018 | ||
LU | 16.01.2018 | ||
MT | 16.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 20.02.2018 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
GB | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
IE | 16.01.2018 | ||
LU | 16.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 20.02.2018 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
GB | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
IE | 16.01.2018 | ||
LU | 16.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 20.02.2018 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
LU | 16.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 20.02.2018 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
LU | 16.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FR | 20.02.2018 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
LU | 16.01.2018 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 20.12.2017 | |
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5867089 (ZYBURT JEFFREY P [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 3, lines 29-32; figures 1,6,7,9; claims 1-3,5 * * column 4, lines 54-57 - column 5, lines 15-17 * * column 6, lines 47-52 - column 12, lines 24-47 * * column 14, line 45 - column 15, line 40 *; | [A]US2008147306 (HAYASHI TAKAO [JP]) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0007] - [0009] - [0014] , [0017] , [0101] - [0104] - [0107]; figures 2,9-11; claims 1,3 *; | [AD]US2010228389 (HAYASHI TAKAO [JP]) [AD] 1-6* paragraphs [0045] - [0048] - [0052]; figure 5 * | by applicant | JP4399739B | JP4798554B |