EP2617513 - Apparatus and method for on line surface enhancement of a workpiece [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/30] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation One Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ei-Wardany, Tahany, Ibrahim 14 C West Lane Bloomfield, CT Connecticut 06002 / US | 02 /
Viens, Daniel V. 167 S Bedlam Road Mansfield Center, CT Connecticut 06250 / US | 03 /
Grelotti, Robert A. 39 Alexander Road Colchester, CT Connecticut 06415 / US | 04 /
Sangiovanni, Joseph J. 150 South Stone Street P.O. Box 363 West Suffield, CT Connecticut 06093 / US | 05 /
Zimmerman, John F. 183 High Wood Drive South Glastonbury, CT Connecticut 06073 / US | 06 /
Zhang, Yan 200 Regan Road, Apt. 26C Vernon, CT Connecticut 06066 / US | [2013/30] | Representative(s) | Hall, Matthew Benjamin, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/30] | Tomlinson, Kerry John Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 13151750.0 | 17.01.2013 | [2013/30] | Priority number, date | US201213351380 | 17.01.2012 Original published format: US201213351380 | [2013/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2617513 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2617513 | Date: | 11.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/00, B23P23/04, C21D7/06 | [2013/30] | CPC: |
B23K26/0093 (EP,US);
B23K26/356 (EP,US);
B23P23/04 (EP,US);
B23P9/04 (EP,US);
C21D7/06 (EP,US);
B23K2101/001 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/30] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Oberflächenverbesserung eines Werkstücks auf der Fertigungslinie | [2013/30] | English: | Apparatus and method for on line surface enhancement of a workpiece | [2013/30] | French: | Appareil et procédé d'amélioration d'une surface en ligne de pièce à usiner | [2013/30] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/10] | 04.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 14.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/07] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 14.05.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 14.05.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.05.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.01.2013 | AL | 11.03.2015 | AT | 11.03.2015 | BE | 11.03.2015 | BG | 11.03.2015 | CY | 11.03.2015 | CZ | 11.03.2015 | DK | 11.03.2015 | EE | 11.03.2015 | ES | 11.03.2015 | FI | 11.03.2015 | HR | 11.03.2015 | IT | 11.03.2015 | LT | 11.03.2015 | LV | 11.03.2015 | MC | 11.03.2015 | MK | 11.03.2015 | NL | 11.03.2015 | PL | 11.03.2015 | RO | 11.03.2015 | RS | 11.03.2015 | SE | 11.03.2015 | SI | 11.03.2015 | SK | 11.03.2015 | SM | 11.03.2015 | TR | 11.03.2015 | NO | 11.06.2015 | GR | 12.06.2015 | IS | 11.07.2015 | PT | 13.07.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 17.01.2013 | |
AT | 11.03.2015 | ||
BE | 11.03.2015 | ||
BG | 11.03.2015 | ||
CY | 11.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
MK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
SM | 11.03.2015 | ||
TR | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 17.01.2013 | |
AT | 11.03.2015 | ||
BE | 11.03.2015 | ||
CY | 11.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
MK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
SM | 11.03.2015 | ||
TR | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 17.01.2013 | |
AT | 11.03.2015 | ||
BE | 11.03.2015 | ||
CY | 11.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
MK | 11.03.2015 | ||
MT | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
SM | 11.03.2015 | ||
TR | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 17.01.2013 | |
AT | 11.03.2015 | ||
BE | 11.03.2015 | ||
CY | 11.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
MK | 11.03.2015 | ||
MT | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
SM | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
BE | 11.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
MT | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
BE | 11.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
BE | 11.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 11.03.2015 | |
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 11.03.2015 | |
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | ES | 11.03.2015 | |
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | ES | 11.03.2015 | |
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 11.03.2015 | |
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 11.03.2015 | |
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 11.03.2015 | |
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 11.03.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE102007032044 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-6 * the whole document * [A] 7-14; | [XA]EP1961514 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 13 * the whole document * [A] 1-6; | [XPAI]US2012216587 (WEBSTER JOHN R [GB]) [XP] 1-6,9 * the whole document * [A] 7,8,13,14 [I] 10 |