EP2620748 - Device for providing or generating intertwined information related to a space of interest. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.04.2017 [2017/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HYUNDAI MOTOR COMPANY 231, Yangjae-dong, Seocho-gu Seoul 137-938 / KR | [2013/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kwon, Soon Sung 104-1806, Samsung Raemian Apt. Pyeongchon-dong Dongan-gu, Gueonggi-do 431-904 Anyang-si / KR | 02 /
Park, Cheol Woo 107-1704, Garak Kumho Apt,. Garakbon-dong Songpa-gu 138-751 Seoul / KR | [2013/31] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/31] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13151889.6 | 18.01.2013 | [2013/31] | Priority number, date | US201261591053P | 26.01.2012 Original published format: US 201261591053 P | [2013/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2620748 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2620748 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/32, G01C21/36, G06F17/30 | [2016/16] | CPC: |
G06F16/9537 (EP,US);
G01C21/3679 (EP);
G06F16/29 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/31] | G01C21/32, G01C21/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Bereitstellung oder Erzeugung von verknüpften Ortsinformationen | [2013/31] | English: | Device for providing or generating intertwined information related to a space of interest. | [2013/31] | French: | Appareil pour donner ou générer des informations de point d'interêt interreliées | [2013/31] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/16] | 29.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US6154213 (RENNISON EARL F [US], et al) [I] 1-13 * column 3, lines 29-50 * * column 8, lines 28-41 *; | [I]US2002002552 (SCHULTZ TROY L [US], et al) [I] 1-13 * paragraph [0016] * * paragraphs [0039] - [0041] *; | [I]US2003041069 (YORKE GORDON JAMES [CA]) [I] 1-13 * paragraphs [0010] , [0011] *; | [I]KR20100123264 (HYUNDAI MOTOR CO LTD [KR]) [I] 1-13 * abstract *; | [P]EP2431938 (HYUNDAI MOTOR CO LTD [KR]) [P] * paragraphs [0021] - [0031] * * paragraphs [0039] - [0041] * * paragraphs [0047] - [0049] *; | [I] - BURNS L M ET AL, "A GRAPHICAL ENTITY-RELATIONSHIP DATABASE BROWSER", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL HAWAII INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ONSYSTEM SCIENCES, XX, XX, (19880101), vol. 2, pages 694 - 704, XP000569097 [I] 1-13 * abstract * |