EP2757537 - Medication dispenser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evondos Oy Salorankatu 5-7 24240 Salo / FI | [2014/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Apell, Mika Sirkkalankatu 27 A 9 20700 Turku / FI | 02 /
Niinistö, Jyrki Putolantie 12 24800 Halikko / FI | [2014/30] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy, Turku P.O. Box 99 Tykistökatu 2-4 B 20521 Turku / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2014/30] | Turun Patenttitoimisto Oy P.O. Box 99 20521 Turku / FI | Application number, filing date | 13152012.4 | 21.01.2013 | [2014/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2757537 | Date: | 23.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G07F11/68, A61J7/04, G06F19/00, G07F17/00 | [2014/30] | CPC: |
G07F11/68 (EP,US);
A61J7/0076 (EP);
G07F17/0092 (EP);
G16H20/13 (EP,US);
A61J7/0427 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Medikamentenspender | [2014/30] | English: | Medication dispenser | [2014/30] | French: | Distributeur de médicaments | [2014/30] | Examination procedure | 21.01.2013 | Examination requested [2014/30] | 24.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/30] | 03.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/30] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2007129318 (IRODY INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US2008059228 (BOSSI CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [I]US2008119958 (BEAR DAVID M [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] , [0018] - [0021] - [0024] - [0033] *; | [XI]WO2009095904 (RESCUE DOSE LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1,10 * abstract * * page 6, line 16 - page 7, line 17 * * page 14, line 21 - page 18, line 27 * * page 21, lines 5-32 * * page 24, line 27 - page 27, line 12 * [I] 1-15; | [A]US2010249997 (GREYSHOCK SHAWN T [US], et al) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [A]US2012004770 (OOYEN WES VAN [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]WO2012007411 (ST MICROELECTRONICS GRENOBLE 2 [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * |