EP2641669 - Shaping machine, in particular bending machine and method for reconfigurating such a shaping machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Otto Bihler Handels-Beteiligungs-GmbH Lechbrucker Strasse 15 87642 Halblech / DE | [2013/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bihler, Mathias Schleiferweg 2 87642 Halblech / DE | 02 /
Maldoner, Paul Almstraße 2 3/4 87669 Rieden / DE | 03 /
Gast, Oskar Am Steinacker 4 87637 Eisenberg / DE | [2013/39] | Representative(s) | Tiesmeyer, Johannes Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/39] | Tiesmeyer, Johannes Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13152173.4 | 22.01.2013 | [2013/39] | Priority number, date | DE201210204740 | 23.03.2012 Original published format: DE102012204740 | [2013/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2641669 | Date: | 25.09.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2641669 | Date: | 14.05.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B21F1/00, B21D7/02 | [2013/39] | CPC: |
B21D43/028 (EP);
B21D7/02 (EP);
B21F1/00 (EP);
B21F1/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/39] | Title | German: | Umformungsmaschine, insbesondere Biegemaschine und Verfahren zum Ausrichten einer solchen Umformmaschine | [2013/39] | English: | Shaping machine, in particular bending machine and method for reconfigurating such a shaping machine | [2013/39] | French: | Machine de déformage, notamment cintreuse et procédé pour reconfigurer telle machine de déformage | [2013/39] | Examination procedure | 09.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/03] | 30.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.03.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.01.2013 | AL | 14.05.2014 | BG | 14.05.2014 | CY | 14.05.2014 | DK | 14.05.2014 | EE | 14.05.2014 | FI | 14.05.2014 | HR | 14.05.2014 | LT | 14.05.2014 | LV | 14.05.2014 | MC | 14.05.2014 | MK | 14.05.2014 | MT | 14.05.2014 | NL | 14.05.2014 | RO | 14.05.2014 | RS | 14.05.2014 | SE | 14.05.2014 | SI | 14.05.2014 | SK | 14.05.2014 | SM | 14.05.2014 | TR | 14.05.2014 | NO | 14.08.2014 | GR | 15.08.2014 | IS | 14.09.2014 | PT | 15.09.2014 | IE | 22.01.2015 | LU | 22.01.2015 | BE | 31.01.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 22.01.2013 | |
BG | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
MK | 14.05.2014 | ||
MT | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
SM | 14.05.2014 | ||
TR | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
IE | 22.01.2015 | ||
LU | 22.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 22.01.2013 | |
BG | 14.05.2014 | ||
CY | 14.05.2014 | ||
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
MT | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
TR | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
IE | 22.01.2015 | ||
LU | 22.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
MT | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
IE | 22.01.2015 | ||
LU | 22.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
IE | 22.01.2015 | ||
LU | 22.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/43] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
MC | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
LU | 22.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
LU | 22.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SI | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
NL | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
RO | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
EE | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
SK | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
DK | 14.05.2014 | ||
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
PT | 15.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
RS | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
HR | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
LV | 14.05.2014 | ||
SE | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
GR | 15.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
FI | 14.05.2014 | ||
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
NO | 14.08.2014 | ||
IS | 14.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 14.05.2014 | |
LT | 14.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 14.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE20208825U (BEBECO TECHNOLOGIE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-16 * abstract *; | [A]DE2926905 (BUCH AUGUSTO) [A] 1-16 * figures 1,3,4; claim 1 *; | [A]EP1529578 (BIHLER OTTO HANDELS BETEILIGUNGS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] *; | [AD]DE19605647 (BIHLER MATHIAS [DE]) [AD] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US3052277 (ERNST STEGMANN) [A] 1-16 * figures 1-4 * | [A] - Otto Bihler, "GRM-NC", (20120315), page 1, URL: http://www.youtube.com/watch?v=c2NxL3HX73c, (20130522), XP054975150 [A] 1-16 * 1:10-1:25 * |