EP2624620 - Human-readable, semi-persistent overlay that dynamically displays a changeable operational state of a radio base station [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.01.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/32] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson AB (Publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Norman, Mårten Ericsson AB Kälkbacken 1 SE-163 54 SWEDEN SE-163 54 Spånga / SE | 02 /
Sparr, Marie Ericsson AB Skylvägen 108 SE-187 54 Täby / SE | [2013/32] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/32] | Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich Ericsson AB Patent Unit Kista RAN 1 Torshamnsgatan 23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 13152313.6 | 23.01.2013 | [2013/32] | Priority number, date | US201213365426 | 03.02.2012 Original published format: US201213365426 | [2013/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2624620 | Date: | 07.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2624620 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/04 | [2013/32] | CPC: |
H04W24/00 (EP,US);
H04W88/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vom Menschen lesbare, semipersistente Überlagerung zur dynamischen Anzeige eines veränderlichen Betriebszustands einer Funkbasisstation | [2013/32] | English: | Human-readable, semi-persistent overlay that dynamically displays a changeable operational state of a radio base station | [2013/32] | French: | Recouvrement semi-persistant lisible par une personne affichant dynamiquement un état de fonctionnement modifiable d'une station de base radio | [2013/32] | Examination procedure | 09.01.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2009103858 (MARISENSE OY [FI], et al) [I] 1-12 * abstract * * page 2, lines 3-27 * * page 5, line 19 * * page 6, lines 13-30 * * page 8, line 11 - page 9, line 26 * * page 12, lines 16-17 *; | [I]US2011115631 (DROESLER MANUEL [DE], et al) [I] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0007] , [0008] , [0013] , [0019] , [0023] , [0027] - [0033] - [0044] , [0056] , [0087] *; | [I]US2006282324 (MORI HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [I] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0019] - [0024] - [0036] - [0041] - [0049] , [0050] , [0057] , [0059] * * paragraphs [0125] - [0134] - [0138] , [0141] , [0142] , [0150] , [0154] * | by applicant | US2008121246 | US7167155 | US6120588 |