EP2626837 - System for creating three-dimensional representations from real models having similar and pre-determined characteristics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.12.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.01.2019 [2019/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Total Immersion 26 avenue du Général de Gaulle 92150 Suresnes / FR | [2013/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rollet, Renan 100 avenue de la République 93170 Bagnolet / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/33] | 01 /
Rollet, Renan 100 avenue de la République 93170 BAGNOLET / FR | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/34] | Santarelli 49, avenue des Champs Elysées 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2013/33] | Imbert de Tremiolles, Ghislain Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée B.P. 237 75822 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 13152779.8 | 25.01.2013 | [2013/33] | Priority number, date | FR20120051338 | 13.02.2012 Original published format: FR 1251338 | [2013/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2626837 | Date: | 14.08.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06T15/04 | [2013/33] | CPC: |
G06T15/04 (EP,US);
H04N13/243 (US);
G06T7/593 (EP,US);
H04N13/156 (EP,US);
H04N13/204 (US);
H04N13/261 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | System zur Erstellung drei-dimensionaler Darstellungen von echten Objekten mit ähnlichen und vorbestimmten Merkmalen | [2013/33] | English: | System for creating three-dimensional representations from real models having similar and pre-determined characteristics | [2013/33] | French: | Système de création de représentations tridimensionnelles à partir de modèles réels ayant des caractéristiques similaires et prédéterminées | [2013/33] | Examination procedure | 31.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/11] | 03.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/05] | 11.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/05] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.03.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2015 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.04.2015 | 31.01.2016 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.04.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2885231 (LORRAINE SOLE SOC D OPTIQUE SA [FR]) [A] 1-10 * abstract ** page 7, line 7 - line 11; figure 3 *; | [XI]FR2955409 (FITTINGBOX [FR]) [X] 1-3,5,7,8 * page 3, line 12 - page 7, line 20 * * page 11, line 15 - page 39, line 13 * * figures 2,4,9 * [I] 4,6,9,10; | [A] - DEBEVEC P E ET AL, "MODELING AND RENDERING ARCHITECTURE FROM PHOTOGRAPHS: A HYBRID GEOMETRY-AND IMAGE-BASED APPROACH", COMPUTER GRAPHICS PROCEEDINGS 1996 (SIGGRAPH). NEW ORLEANS, AUG. 4 - 9, 1996; [COMPUTER GRAPHICS PROCEEDINGS (SIGGRAPH)], NEW YORK, NY : ACM, US, (19960804), pages 11 - 20, XP000682717 [A] 1-10 * abstract * * section 3 * * figures 11,12 * |