EP2629115 - Sensor device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.01.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.02.2016 [2016/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hella KGaA Hueck & Co. Rixbecker Strasse 75 59552 Lippstadt / DE | [2013/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wixfort, Thomas Brinkstrasse 33 33330 Gütersloh / DE | 02 /
von Rhein, Andreas Westring 105 33154 Salzkotten / DE | [2013/34] | Application number, filing date | 13152800.2 | 28.01.2013 | [2013/34] | Priority number, date | DE201210101303 | 17.02.2012 Original published format: DE102012101303 | [2013/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2629115 | Date: | 21.08.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/42, G01S13/87, G01S13/93, G01S7/35 | [2013/34] | CPC: |
G01S7/354 (EP,US);
H03K3/01 (US);
G01S13/42 (EP,US);
G01S13/878 (EP,US);
G01S13/931 (EP,US);
G01S2013/9316 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Sensorvorrichtung | [2013/34] | English: | Sensor device | [2013/34] | French: | Dispositif de détection | [2013/34] | Examination procedure | 08.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2013 | Examination requested [2013/47] | 07.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 28.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/08] | 24.05.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.11.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO02095443 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [Y] 1,4,6,8-10 * page 4, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * page 9, paragraph 2; figure 1 *; | [Y]WO03008996 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [Y] 1-3,5,8-10 * page 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * page 3, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 *; | [Y]WO03014765 (ROKE MANOR RESEARCH [GB], et al) [Y] 1,8-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE10261027 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0004] , [0025] , [0026]; figures 8,9 *; | [Y]DE102005056800 (VALEO SCHALTER & SENSOREN GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1,8-10* the whole document *; | [Y]DE102006049879 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 3,10 * paragraph [0038]; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]EP2180336 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [Y] 1,2,4-10 * paragraphs [0006] , [0012] - [0021]; figures 1,2,5 *; | [Y]DE102009024064 (VALEO SCHALTER & SENSOREN GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 4] , [0010] , [0011] , [0022] - [0024] - [0026] , [0040] , [0046]; figures 1,2 * |