EP2589978 - Defining adaptive detection thresholds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2018 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2017/23] |
Former [2013/19] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (Publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kangas, Ari Skridskovägen 1 181 29 Lidingö / SE | 02 /
Siomina, Iana Mäster Simons Väg 20, D41 170 66 Solna / SE | [2013/19] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2017/23] |
Former [2013/19] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13153809.2 | 09.12.2010 | [2013/19] | Priority number, date | US20090286049P | 14.12.2009 Original published format: US 286049 P | [2013/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2589978 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2589978 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/02, H04L27/26, H04B1/7075 | [2013/19] | CPC: |
G01S5/0215 (EP,US);
G01S5/01 (EP);
G01S5/02216 (EP,US);
G01S5/02527 (EP,US);
H04L27/2647 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/23] |
Former [2013/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Definition adaptiver Erkennungsschwellen | [2013/19] | English: | Defining adaptive detection thresholds | [2013/19] | French: | Définition des seuils de détection adaptatif | [2013/19] | Examination procedure | 23.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/36] | 29.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10809053.1 / EP2513662 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.12.2010 | AL | 07.06.2017 | AT | 07.06.2017 | CY | 07.06.2017 | CZ | 07.06.2017 | DK | 07.06.2017 | EE | 07.06.2017 | ES | 07.06.2017 | FI | 07.06.2017 | HR | 07.06.2017 | IT | 07.06.2017 | LT | 07.06.2017 | LV | 07.06.2017 | MC | 07.06.2017 | MK | 07.06.2017 | PL | 07.06.2017 | PT | 07.06.2017 | RO | 07.06.2017 | RS | 07.06.2017 | SE | 07.06.2017 | SI | 07.06.2017 | SK | 07.06.2017 | SM | 07.06.2017 | TR | 07.06.2017 | BG | 07.09.2017 | NO | 07.09.2017 | GR | 08.09.2017 | IS | 07.10.2017 | IE | 09.12.2017 | LU | 09.12.2017 | MT | 09.12.2017 | BE | 31.12.2017 | CH | 31.12.2017 | LI | 31.12.2017 | FR | 02.01.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 09.12.2010 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CY | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
MK | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PT | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
TR | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
IE | 09.12.2017 | ||
LU | 09.12.2017 | ||
MT | 09.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 09.12.2010 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CY | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
MK | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
TR | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
IE | 09.12.2017 | ||
LU | 09.12.2017 | ||
MT | 09.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 09.12.2010 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CY | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
MK | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
IE | 09.12.2017 | ||
LU | 09.12.2017 | ||
MT | 09.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 09.12.2010 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CY | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
IE | 09.12.2017 | ||
LU | 09.12.2017 | ||
MT | 09.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 09.12.2010 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
IE | 09.12.2017 | ||
LU | 09.12.2017 | ||
MT | 09.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
IE | 09.12.2017 | ||
LU | 09.12.2017 | ||
MT | 09.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
IE | 09.12.2017 | ||
LU | 09.12.2017 | ||
MT | 09.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
IE | 09.12.2017 | ||
LU | 09.12.2017 | ||
MT | 09.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
IE | 09.12.2017 | ||
LU | 09.12.2017 | ||
MT | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
LU | 09.12.2017 | ||
MT | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
DK | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
IT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 07.06.2017 | |
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | ES | 07.06.2017 | |
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
RS | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | ES | 07.06.2017 | |
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007046534 (ZIEDAN NESREEN I [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0065] *; | [A]US2008165903 (HOOLI KARI [FI], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0048] * * figure 4 * * Embodiment 2 ** Embodiment 3 *; | [A] - DAVID W MATOLAK ET AL, "Efficient statistical parallel interference cancellation for DS-CDMA in Rayleigh fading channels", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20070201), vol. 6, no. 2, doi:10.1109/TWC.2007.05264, ISSN 1536-1276, pages 566 - 574, XP011165486 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TWC.2007.05264 |