EP2631606 - Assembly for detecting pivot angles on a rotating component [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2013/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schelling, Christoph Hoffeldstrasse 218 70597 Stuttgart / DE | [2013/35] | Application number, filing date | 13153957.9 | 05.02.2013 | [2013/35] | Priority number, date | DE201210202660 | 21.02.2012 Original published format: DE102012202660 | [2013/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2631606 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2631606 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/34, G01D5/347, B62D15/02 | [2014/49] | CPC: |
G01D5/345 (EP);
B62D15/0215 (EP);
B62D15/0245 (EP);
G01D5/34784 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/35] | G01D5/34, G01D5/347 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Anordnung zur Erfassung von Drehwinkeln an einem rotierenden Bauteil | [2013/35] | English: | Assembly for detecting pivot angles on a rotating component | [2013/35] | French: | Agencement de détection d'angles de rotation sur un composant rotatif | [2013/35] | Examination procedure | 04.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/49] | 13.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]FR2954493 (UNIV STRASBOURG [FR]) [X] 1,3,4,7,9,10 * page 4, line 4 - page 5, line 31 * * page 7, line 34 - line 37 * * page 8, line 10 - page 10, line 36 * * page 13, line 3 - line 36 * * figures 1-6 * [I] 2,5,6,8; | [A]US2005211886 (CHIN YEE L [MY], et al) [A] 1 * column 21 - column 32 * * column 50 - column 59 * * figures 3-12 *; | [A]US3938890 (FLAVELL EVAN R) [A] 1 * column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 51 * * column 5, line 58 - column 6, line 12 * * figures 1,5 *; | [A]US4958072 (HOFLER THOMAS [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 7 - column 5, line 31 * * pages 1-3 * | by applicant | DE4409892 |