EP2628698 - A rope of a lifting device, an elevator and a method for manufacturing the rope [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 17.03.2023 Database last updated on 30.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kone Corporation Kartanontie 1 00330 Helsinki / FI | [2013/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pelto-Huikko, Raimo c/o KONE Corporation Kartanontie 1 00330 Helsinki / FI | 02 /
Kere, Petri c/o KONE Corporation Kartanontie 1 00330 Helsinki / FI | [2016/15] |
Former [2013/34] | 01 /
Pelto-Huikko, Raimo Lammastie 12 C 15 01710 Vantaa / FI | ||
02 /
Kere, Petri Sotkamonkuja 8 00560 Helsinki / FI | Representative(s) | Glück Kritzenberger Patentanwälte PartGmbB Franz-Mayer-Str. 16a 93053 Regensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/15] | Glück Kritzenberger Patentanwälte PartGmbB Hermann-Köhl-Strasse 2a 93049 Regensburg / DE | ||
Former [2013/34] | Graf Glück Kritzenberger Hermann-Köhl-Strasse 2a 93049 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 13154456.1 | 07.02.2013 | [2013/34] | Priority number, date | FI20120005151 | 13.02.2012 Original published format: FI 20125151 | [2013/34] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2628698 | Date: | 21.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2628698 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2628698 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2628698 | Date: | 19.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B66B7/06, B66B7/12 | [2013/49] | CPC: |
B66B7/062 (EP,FI,US);
B29D99/00 (US);
B66B5/0025 (US);
B66B7/1238 (EP,US);
B66B9/00 (US);
D07B1/04 (FI);
D07B1/145 (EP,US);
D07B1/22 (EP,US);
D07B2201/2096 (EP,US);
D07B2205/201 (EP,US);
D07B2205/2046 (EP,US);
D07B2205/205 (EP,US);
D07B2205/2096 (EP,US);
D07B2205/3003 (EP,US);
D07B2205/3007 (EP,US);
D07B2301/252 (EP);
D07B2301/259 (EP);
D07B2301/5577 (EP);
| C-Set: |
D07B2205/201, D07B2801/10 (EP,US);
D07B2205/2046, D07B2801/10 (EP,US);
D07B2205/205, D07B2801/10 (US,EP);
D07B2205/2096, D07B2801/10 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2013/34] | B66B7/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] |
Former [2013/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Seil einer Hebevorrichtung, Aufzug und Verfahren zur Herstellung des Seils | [2013/34] | English: | A rope of a lifting device, an elevator and a method for manufacturing the rope | [2013/34] | French: | Corde d'un dispositif de levage, ascenseur et procédé de fabrication de la corde | [2013/34] | Examination procedure | 30.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/11] | 16.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16150879.1 / EP3023377 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.01.2017
26.01.2017
ADMISSIBLE TK Elevator Innovation and Operations GmbH Thyssenkrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE Opponent's representative Kudlek, Franz Thomas, et al, et al DehnsGermany Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten Postfach 33 04 29 80064 München / DE | [2021/36] |
Former [2018/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.01.2017
26.01.2017
ADMISSIBLE thyssenkrupp Elevator AG ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE Opponent's representative Kudlek, Franz Thomas, et al, et al m patent group Postfach 33 04 29 80064 München / DE | ||
Former [2017/08] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.01.2017
ThyssenKrupp Elevator AG ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE Opponent's representative Kudlek, Franz Thomas, et al, et al m patent group Postfach 33 04 29 80064 München / DE | 20.02.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.06.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.04.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.08.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 15.11.2022 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 28.11.2022 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 23.12.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 14.03.2023 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 07.09.2018 | Appeal received No. T2220/18 | 13.12.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 15.11.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 28.11.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 25.09.2018 | Appeal received No. T2220/18 | 12.12.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 15.11.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 28.11.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 15.11.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.02.2013 | AL | 13.04.2016 | AT | 13.04.2016 | BE | 13.04.2016 | BG | 13.04.2016 | CY | 13.04.2016 | CZ | 13.04.2016 | DK | 13.04.2016 | EE | 13.04.2016 | FI | 13.04.2016 | HR | 13.04.2016 | IT | 13.04.2016 | LT | 13.04.2016 | LV | 13.04.2016 | MC | 13.04.2016 | MK | 13.04.2016 | NL | 13.04.2016 | PL | 13.04.2016 | RO | 13.04.2016 | RS | 13.04.2016 | SE | 13.04.2016 | SI | 13.04.2016 | SK | 13.04.2016 | SM | 13.04.2016 | TR | 13.04.2016 | NO | 13.07.2016 | GR | 14.07.2016 | IS | 13.08.2016 | PT | 16.08.2016 | IE | 07.02.2017 | LU | 07.02.2017 | MT | 07.02.2017 | CH | 28.02.2023 | LI | 28.02.2023 | [2023/48] |
Former [2020/33] | HU | 07.02.2013 | |
AL | 13.04.2016 | ||
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
MK | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
TR | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
IS | 13.08.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
IE | 07.02.2017 | ||
LU | 07.02.2017 | ||
MT | 07.02.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 07.02.2013 | |
AL | 13.04.2016 | ||
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
MK | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
TR | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
IE | 07.02.2017 | ||
LU | 07.02.2017 | ||
MT | 07.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 07.02.2013 | |
AL | 13.04.2016 | ||
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
MK | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
IE | 07.02.2017 | ||
LU | 07.02.2017 | ||
MT | 07.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 07.02.2013 | |
AL | 13.04.2016 | ||
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
IE | 07.02.2017 | ||
LU | 07.02.2017 | ||
MT | 07.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 07.02.2013 | |
AL | 13.04.2016 | ||
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
IE | 07.02.2017 | ||
LU | 07.02.2017 | ||
MT | 07.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 07.02.2013 | |
AL | 13.04.2016 | ||
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
IE | 07.02.2017 | ||
LU | 07.02.2017 | ||
MT | 07.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 13.04.2016 | |
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
IE | 07.02.2017 | ||
LU | 07.02.2017 | ||
MT | 07.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
IE | 07.02.2017 | ||
LU | 07.02.2017 | ||
MT | 07.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
IE | 07.02.2017 | ||
LU | 07.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/04] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
LU | 07.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 13.04.2016 | |
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 13.04.2016 | |
NO | 13.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2001302135 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]US2005226584 (WILLIAMS JERRY G [US], et al); | [Y]US2005285059 (GERBER TERRY L [US], et al); | [Y]US2006018586 (KISHIDA KINZO [JP]); | [XDAYI]WO2009090299 (KONE CORP [FI], et al); | [Y]US2009268198 (BRENDEL JURGEN [CH]); | [XAYI]WO2011029726 (SGL CARBON SE [DE], et al); | [E]WO2013110853 (KONE CORP [FI]) | Examination | EP2356054 | by applicant | WO2009090299 | Opposition | DE29618796U | US2008087500 | WO2009124813 | WO2011029726 | EP1886795 | EP1930497 | EP1886795 |