EP2625986 - Modular piece of furniture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.07.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pintore, Isa Via dei Pepi 37 50122 Firenze (FI) / IT | For all designated states Condorelli, Alessandro Via Bonifacio Lupi 11 50129 Firenze (FI) / IT | [2013/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/33] | Representative(s) | Emmi, Mario Studio Brevetti Turini S.r.l. Via Lamarmora, 55 50121 Firenze / IT | [2013/33] | Application number, filing date | 13154540.2 | 08.02.2013 | [2013/33] | Priority number, date | IT2012FI00007U | 10.02.2012 Original published format: IT FI20120007 U | [2013/33] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2625986 | Date: | 14.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A47B85/04, A47D11/00, A47D9/00, A47C13/00, A47C4/03 | [2013/33] | CPC: |
A47B47/047 (EP,US);
A47B87/02 (EP);
A47C13/005 (EP);
A47C4/03 (EP);
A47D11/002 (EP);
A47D11/005 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/33] | Extension states | BA | 08.02.2013 | ME | 08.02.2013 | Title | German: | Modulares Möbel | [2013/33] | English: | Modular piece of furniture | [2013/33] | French: | Élément modulaire de mobilier | [2013/33] | Examination procedure | 15.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/33] | 28.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/33] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]SE327792 (MO OCH DOMSJOE AB [SE]) [X] 1,4-6,9 * figure - * [I] 2; | [A]GB1240054 (PRICE BROTHERS & COMPANY LTD) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]BE773678 (BRUYNE LUC DE) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [X]DE3242148 (PRANGE GERHARD [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-6,10-12 * figure - *; | [A]KR20100007999U (ANONYM) [A] 1* figure - * |