EP2765674 - Method for autodetection and setting of battery voltage rating in an electrical substation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALSTOM Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2014/33] | For all designated states Alstom Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Richards, Simon 7 Salter Grange Abbots Bromley Staffordshire, WS15 3DZ / GB | 02 /
Venkatamaran, Krishnakumar 12 Helston Close Saxonfields Staffordshire, ST17 0GZ / GB | [2014/33] | Representative(s) | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 95, Rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/33] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | Application number, filing date | 13154661.6 | 08.02.2013 | [2014/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2765674 | Date: | 13.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00 | [2014/33] | CPC: |
H02J11/00 (EP,US);
H02J7/00041 (EP);
H02J7/00047 (EP,US);
H02J7/0047 (EP,US);
H02J7/007182 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Selbsterkennung und Einstellen der Batteriespannungsbewertung in einer elektrischen Unterstation | [2014/33] | English: | Method for autodetection and setting of battery voltage rating in an electrical substation | [2014/33] | French: | Procédé d'autodétection et de réglage de tension nominale de batterie dans une sous-station électrique | [2014/33] | Examination procedure | 05.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/03] | 24.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/07] | 01.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.04.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4639655 (WESTHAVER LAWRENCE A [US], et al) [Y] 3 * column 4, line 14 - line 54 *; | [A]EP0692859 (WYSS PATRICK IMPEX [CH]) [A] 1-6* the whole document *; | [XAYI]US2009009183 (MOUSAVI MIRRASOUL J [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0086] * [A] 4,6 [Y] 3 [I] 5 |