EP2636423 - Embolic filter frame [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W. L. Gore & Associates, Inc. 555 Paper Mill Road P.O. Box 9206 Newark DE 19714 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2015/43] | For all designated states W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc. 555 Paper Mill Road P.O. Box 9206 Newark DE 19714 / US | ||
Former [2013/37] | For all designated states Gore Enterprise Holdings, Inc. 551 Paper Mill Road, P.O. Box 9206 Newark, DE 19714-9206 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cully, Edward H. 940 North Sinagua Heights Drive Flagstaff, AZ Arizona 86004 / US | 02 /
Vonesh, Michael J. 3885E Kokopelli Lane Flagstaff, AZ Arizona 86004 / US | [2013/37] | Representative(s) | HGF Delta House 50 West Nile Street Glasgow G1 2NP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/49] | Wilson, Gary, et al HGF Limited Delta House 50 West Nile Street Glasgow G1 2NP / GB | ||
Former [2013/37] | Rankin, Douglas Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | Application number, filing date | 13154957.8 | 16.10.2003 | [2013/37] | Priority number, date | US20020273859 | 17.10.2002 Original published format: US 273859 | [2013/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2636423 | Date: | 11.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2636423 | Date: | 27.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2636423 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61M29/00 | [2013/37] | CPC: |
A61F2/0105 (EP,US);
B23P11/00 (US);
A61F2002/018 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0006 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0067 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/49] |
Former [2013/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Emboliefilterrahmen | [2013/37] | English: | Embolic filter frame | [2013/37] | French: | Cadre de filtre embolique | [2013/37] | Examination procedure | 12.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/25] | 16.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03809115.3 / EP1558325 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030809115) is 05.08.2008 | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.10.2003 | AT | 07.12.2016 | BE | 07.12.2016 | CY | 07.12.2016 | CZ | 07.12.2016 | DK | 07.12.2016 | EE | 07.12.2016 | ES | 07.12.2016 | FI | 07.12.2016 | MC | 07.12.2016 | NL | 07.12.2016 | RO | 07.12.2016 | SI | 07.12.2016 | SK | 07.12.2016 | TR | 07.12.2016 | BG | 07.03.2017 | GR | 08.03.2017 | PT | 07.04.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 16.10.2003 | |
AT | 07.12.2016 | ||
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CY | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 16.10.2003 | |
AT | 07.12.2016 | ||
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | BE | 07.12.2016 | |
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | ES | 07.12.2016 | |
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4425908 (SIMON MORRIS [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-14; | [A]WO9944510 (BIOGUIDE CONSULTING INC [US], et al) [A] 15 * abstract *; | [A]WO0145592 (PERCUSURGE INC [US]) [A] 15* abstract *; | [XA]US6391044 (YADAV JAY S [US], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-14 | Examination | WO0149185 |