EP2597066 - Mobile lift crane with variable position counterweight [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.2021 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 22.12.2021 [2021/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Manitowoc Crane Companies, LLC 2400 South 44th Street Manitowoc, WI 54221 / US | [2013/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pech, David. J 610 Cherry Road Manitowoc, WI Wisconsin 54220 / US | 02 /
Porubcansky, Kenneth. J 10110 Diamond Road Whitelaw, WI Wisconsin 54227 / US | [2013/22] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2020/50] |
Former [2013/51] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2013/22] | Merrifield, Sarah Elizabeth Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 13155808.2 | 15.10.2007 | [2013/22] | Priority number, date | US20060863265 | 27.10.2006 Original published format: US 863265 | US20070733104 | 09.04.2007 Original published format: US 733104 | [2013/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2597066 | Date: | 29.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2597066 | Date: | 09.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B66C23/76 | [2013/22] | CPC: |
B66C23/76 (EP,US);
B66C23/90 (KR);
B66C23/24 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2013/22] | Title | German: | Mobiler Hubkran mit variabel positionierbarem Gegengewicht | [2013/22] | English: | Mobile lift crane with variable position counterweight | [2013/22] | French: | Grue de levage mobile avec contrepoids de position variable | [2020/27] |
Former [2013/22] | Seuil de levage mobile et contrepoids de position variable | Examination procedure | 19.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/22] | 26.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07254071.9 / EP1916220 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070254071) is 10.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 10.09.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 09.12.2020 | IT | 09.12.2020 | [2021/51] |
Former [2021/48] | IT | 09.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6568547 (KRETSCHMER MANFRED [DE], et al) [A] 1,9 * column 5, line 25 - column 7, line 67; figure - *; | [A]DE9404670U (ORENSTEIN & KOPPEL AG [DE]) [A] 1,9 * page 6; figure 2 *; | [A]US3547278 (TAYLER FREDERICK H) [A] 1,9 * the whole document * | Examination | - "Operating Controls and Operation", M-250 X-Spander/Max-Spander Attachment, Manitowoc Engineering Co., (19940208), vol. 3, pages 1 - 4, XP055155663 | - "M-250 Max-Spander Attachment installation and Removal Guide", M-250 Max-Spander Attachment installation and Removal Guide, Manitowoc Engineering Co., (19940306), vol. 3, pages 1 - 16, XP055155658 |