EP2630866 - Door for a deck oven, including an abutment surface for the batch charger [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.03.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EUROFOURS 577, rue Célestin Hennion 59144 Gommegnies / FR | [2013/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Airoldi, Frédéric 29, Rue des Roses 51120 SEZANNE / FR | 02 /
Lemoine, Jérôme 20, Rue des Hirondelles 59460 JEUMONT / FR | [2013/35] | Representative(s) | Balesta, Pierre Cabinet Beau de Loménie Immeuble Eurocentre 179 Boulevard de Turin 59777 Lille / FR | [2013/35] | Application number, filing date | 13155884.3 | 20.02.2013 | [2013/35] | Priority number, date | FR20120051584 | 22.02.2012 Original published format: FR 1251584 | [2013/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2630866 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A21B3/02, A21B3/07 | [2013/35] | CPC: |
A21B3/02 (EP);
A21B3/07 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Tür eines Etagenbackofens, die eine Anschlagfläche für den Ofenbeschicker umfasst | [2016/18] | English: | Door for a deck oven, including an abutment surface for the batch charger | [2013/35] | French: | Porte de four à soles comprenant une surface de butée pour l'enfourneur | [2013/35] |
Former [2013/35] | Tür eines Etagenbackofens, die eine Anschlagsfläche für den Ofenbeschicker umfasst | Examination procedure | 07.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/12] | 23.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/15] | 02.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.06.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]FR1264678 (PAUL ETIENNE DUBOIS) [X] 1 * page 1, column 2, line 37 - page 2, column 1, line 2; figures 1-3 * [Y] 15-17 [I] 2-14; | [YD]DE102006008153 (MIWE MICHAEL WENZ GMBH [DE]) [YD] 15-17 * figure 2 * | by applicant | FR2884276 | FR1516330 | DE102006008153 | AT391979B |