EP2631161 - A method to control a high performance road vehicle equipped with a rear spoiler having at least one adjustable aerodynamic profile [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FERRARI S.p.A. Via Emilia Est, 1163 Modena / IT | [2013/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Luca, Marco Via Pier Traversari, 31 48121 Ravenna / IT | [2013/35] | Representative(s) | Boggio, Luigi, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2013/35] | Application number, filing date | 13156649.9 | 25.02.2013 | [2013/35] | Priority number, date | IT2012BO00089 | 24.02.2012 Original published format: IT BO20120089 | [2013/35] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2631161 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2631161 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B62D35/00, B62D37/02 | [2013/35] | CPC: |
B62D35/007 (EP,US);
B62D37/02 (EP,US);
Y02T10/82 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/35] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Steuerung eines Hochleistungsstraßenfahrzeugs mit einem Heckspoiler mit mindestens einem einstellbaren aerodynamischen Profil | [2013/35] | English: | A method to control a high performance road vehicle equipped with a rear spoiler having at least one adjustable aerodynamic profile | [2013/35] | French: | Procédé pour commander un véhicule routier hautes performances équipé d'un déflecteur arrière ayant au moins un profil aérodynamique réglable | [2013/35] | Examination procedure | 24.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/35] | 16.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 11.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.02.2013 | AL | 08.04.2015 | AT | 08.04.2015 | BE | 08.04.2015 | BG | 08.04.2015 | CY | 08.04.2015 | CZ | 08.04.2015 | DK | 08.04.2015 | EE | 08.04.2015 | ES | 08.04.2015 | FI | 08.04.2015 | HR | 08.04.2015 | LT | 08.04.2015 | LV | 08.04.2015 | MC | 08.04.2015 | MK | 08.04.2015 | NL | 08.04.2015 | PL | 08.04.2015 | RO | 08.04.2015 | RS | 08.04.2015 | SE | 08.04.2015 | SI | 08.04.2015 | SK | 08.04.2015 | SM | 08.04.2015 | TR | 08.04.2015 | NO | 08.07.2015 | GR | 09.07.2015 | IS | 08.08.2015 | PT | 10.08.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 25.02.2013 | |
AT | 08.04.2015 | ||
BE | 08.04.2015 | ||
BG | 08.04.2015 | ||
CY | 08.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
MK | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | ||
SE | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
SM | 08.04.2015 | ||
TR | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 25.02.2013 | |
AT | 08.04.2015 | ||
BE | 08.04.2015 | ||
CY | 08.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
MK | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | ||
SE | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
SM | 08.04.2015 | ||
TR | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 25.02.2013 | |
AT | 08.04.2015 | ||
BE | 08.04.2015 | ||
CY | 08.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
MK | 08.04.2015 | ||
MT | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | ||
SE | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
SM | 08.04.2015 | ||
TR | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 25.02.2013 | |
AT | 08.04.2015 | ||
BE | 08.04.2015 | ||
CY | 08.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
MK | 08.04.2015 | ||
MT | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | ||
SE | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
SM | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
BE | 08.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
MT | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | ||
SE | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
BE | 08.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
BE | 08.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 08.04.2015 | |
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 08.04.2015 | |
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 08.04.2015 | |
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RS | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/42] | NL | 08.04.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2010030158 (WONG TING KUOK [MY]) [X] 1-3 * page 12, line 18 - page 13, line 3 * * page 15, line 1 - line 13 * * page 17, line 12 - line 20; figure - * [Y] 4,5; | [Y]US4810022 (TAKAGI MICHITOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 4 * sentence 52, paragraph 14 - sentence 5, paragraph 15; figure 15 *; | [Y]US2011148143 (ONDRACEK JOHN [US]) [Y] 5 * figure -; claim 3 * |