EP2634323 - Connecting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2017 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weidemann, Christian Rottstrasse 24 67459 Böhl-Iggelheim / DE | [2013/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/36] | Representative(s) | Bernhardt, Reinhold Patentanwälte Bernhardt/Wolff Partnerschaft mbB Europaallee 17 66113 Saarbrücken / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/03] | Bernhardt, Reinhold Patentanwälte Bernhardt/Wolff Partnerschaft Europaallee 17 66113 Saarbrücken / DE | ||
Former [2013/36] | Bernhardt, Reinhold Patentanwälte Bernhardt Partnerschaft Kobenhüttenweg 43 66123 Saarbrücken / DE | Application number, filing date | 13156668.9 | 26.02.2013 | [2013/36] | Priority number, date | DE201210101639 | 29.02.2012 Original published format: DE102012101639 | [2013/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2634323 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2634323 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2634323 | Date: | 18.01.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/61, // E04B1/04, E05B65/08 | [2016/24] | CPC: |
E04B1/6183 (EP);
E05B65/006 (EP);
E04B1/043 (EP);
E05B65/0817 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/36] | E04B1/61, // E04B1/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/03] |
Former [2013/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 23.09.2014 | ME | 23.09.2014 | Title | German: | Verbindungsvorrichtung | [2013/36] | English: | Connecting device | [2013/36] | French: | Dispositif d'assemblage | [2013/36] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/44] | 18.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.05.2015 | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2015 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   16.04.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.02.2013 | AL | 18.01.2017 | CY | 18.01.2017 | CZ | 18.01.2017 | EE | 18.01.2017 | ES | 18.01.2017 | HR | 18.01.2017 | LT | 18.01.2017 | LV | 18.01.2017 | MC | 18.01.2017 | MK | 18.01.2017 | MT | 18.01.2017 | PL | 18.01.2017 | RO | 18.01.2017 | RS | 18.01.2017 | SI | 18.01.2017 | SK | 18.01.2017 | SM | 18.01.2017 | TR | 18.01.2017 | IE | 26.02.2017 | LU | 26.02.2017 | BE | 28.02.2017 | CH | 28.02.2017 | LI | 28.02.2017 | FR | 20.03.2017 | BG | 18.04.2017 | GR | 19.04.2017 | IS | 18.05.2017 | PT | 18.05.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 26.02.2013 | |
CY | 18.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
MK | 18.01.2017 | ||
MT | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
TR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IE | 26.02.2017 | ||
LU | 26.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 20.03.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 26.02.2013 | |
CY | 18.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
MK | 18.01.2017 | ||
MT | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
IE | 26.02.2017 | ||
LU | 26.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 20.03.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 26.02.2013 | |
CY | 18.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
MT | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
IE | 26.02.2017 | ||
LU | 26.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 20.03.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 26.02.2013 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
MT | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
IE | 26.02.2017 | ||
LU | 26.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 20.03.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 18.01.2017 | |
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
MT | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
IE | 26.02.2017 | ||
LU | 26.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 20.03.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | CZ | 18.01.2017 | |
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
IE | 26.02.2017 | ||
LU | 26.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 20.03.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | CZ | 18.01.2017 | |
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
LU | 26.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 20.03.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/04] | CZ | 18.01.2017 | |
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
LU | 26.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 18.01.2017 | |
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | CZ | 18.01.2017 | |
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 18.01.2017 | |
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 18.01.2017 | |
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | ES | 18.01.2017 | |
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | ES | 18.01.2017 | |
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE102007015830 (WEIDEMANN CHRISTIAN [DE]) [AD] 1-10 * figure 1 * * figure 2 * * figure 3 * * figure 4 * | Examination | CH98264 | by applicant | DE102007015830 |