EP2639695 - Apparatus and method for centralized application notifications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2016 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/38] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Satyan, Pallavi 25 Rio Robles E Unit 210 Santa Clara, CA / US | [2013/38] | Representative(s) | Jenkins, Richard Gavin, et al HGF Limited Saviour House 9 St Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/38] | Jenkins, Richard Gavin, et al Harrison Goddard Foote LLP Saviour House 9 St Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13158088.8 | 07.03.2013 | [2013/38] | Priority number, date | US201213418572 | 13.03.2012 Original published format: US201213418572 | [2013/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2639695 | Date: | 18.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2639695 | Date: | 16.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/54, // G06F3/048, H04M1/72 | [2013/38] | CPC: |
G06F9/542 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/14 (KR);
G06F3/147 (KR);
G06F9/44 (KR);
G06F9/451 (KR);
H04M1/72403 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren für zentralisierte Anwendungsbenachrichtigungen | [2013/38] | English: | Apparatus and method for centralized application notifications | [2013/38] | French: | Appareil et procédé pour notifications d'application centralisée | [2013/38] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/09] | 15.12.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6928300 (SKINNER CRAIG [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 15 - column 3, line 7 * * column 8, line 51 - line 65 * * figure 9 * [I] 4-15; | [XI]US2005187896 (MOUSSEAU GARY P [CA]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0014] * [I] 2-15; | [XI]GB2434720 (SONAPTIC LTD [GB]) [X] 1 * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 6 *[I] 2-15 |