EP2602647 - Low layer count reflective polarizer with optimized gain [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.2021 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/24] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company PO Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Derks, Kristopher J. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
Weber, Michael F. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
Hart, Shandon D. 4005 Pine Hill Road Corning, NY 14830 / US | 04 /
Stover, Carl A. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2013/24] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/24] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13158137.3 | 27.03.2009 | [2013/24] | Priority number, date | US20080040910P | 31.03.2008 Original published format: US 40910 P | [2013/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2602647 | Date: | 12.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/30 | [2013/24] | CPC: |
G02B5/3066 (EP,US);
G02B27/283 (US);
G02B5/3041 (US);
G02B5/305 (EP,US);
G02B5/3083 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/24] | Title | German: | Reflektierender Polarisator mit niedriger Schichtzahl mit optimierter Verstärkung | [2013/24] | English: | Low layer count reflective polarizer with optimized gain | [2013/24] | French: | Polariseur réfléchissant à nombre réduit de couches et à gain optimisé | [2013/24] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/04] | 27.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/10] | 23.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/10] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09729145.4 / EP2263111 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20090729145) is 01.03.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2006232863 (NEVITT TIMOTHY J [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7 * paragraphs [0038] , [0061] - [0066]; figure 3 * [I] 4,5,8-13; | [AD]US5882774 (JONZA JAMES M [US], et al) [AD] 1-13 * column 15, line 64 - column 16, line 12 * | by applicant | US3610729 | US4446305 | US4540623 | US5448404 | US5882774 | US5360659 | US5103337 | US6157490 | US6531230 | WO9517303 | WO9939224 | US6368699 | US6783349 | - WEBER, "Giant Birefringent Optics in Multilayer Polymer Mirrors", SCIENCE, (200003), vol. 287, doi:doi:10.1126/science.287.5462.2451, XP000990141 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.287.5462.2451 | US20070939079 |