EP2639968 - Method for localising meters in an electricity distribution network, processing device and associated electricity distribution network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.2015 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SAS 35, rue Joseph Monier 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [2013/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lassalle, Christian 176 chemin du Rozat 38330 Saint-Ismier / FR | 02 /
Waterlot, Frédéric 3 Chemin des Châtaigners 73190 St Baldoph / FR | 03 /
Contini, Erick 15 rue Stella Montis 38240 Meylan / FR | 04 /
Clemence, Michel 130 rue du Mont Jovet 73000 Chambery / FR | 05 /
Coutelou, Olivier 6 rue Hector Berlioz 38000 Grenoble / FR | [2013/38] | Representative(s) | Myon, Gérard Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Lavoix 62, Rue de Bonnel 69003 Lyon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/38] | Myon, Gérard Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Lavoix 62, rue de Bonnel 69003 Lyon / FR | Application number, filing date | 13158324.7 | 08.03.2013 | [2013/38] | Priority number, date | FR20120052208 | 12.03.2012 Original published format: FR 1252208 | [2013/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2639968 | Date: | 18.09.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2639968 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04B3/54, G01D4/00, H04L12/28 | [2013/38] | CPC: |
H04B3/546 (EP);
H04B2203/5433 (EP);
H04B2203/5458 (EP);
H04B2203/5466 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren, Einrichtung und entsprechende Netzwerk zur Ortung einiger Elektrozahler in einem Elektroversorgungsnetzwerk. | [2013/38] | English: | Method for localising meters in an electricity distribution network, processing device and associated electricity distribution network | [2013/38] | French: | Procédé de localisation de points consommateurs de courant dans un système de distribution de courant électrique, dispositif de traitement et système de distribution de courant électrique associés. | [2013/38] | Examination procedure | 30.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/14] | 28.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.03.2014 | Opposition(s) | 21.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/31] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.03.2013 | AL | 20.08.2014 | AT | 20.08.2014 | CY | 20.08.2014 | CZ | 20.08.2014 | DK | 20.08.2014 | EE | 20.08.2014 | FI | 20.08.2014 | HR | 20.08.2014 | LT | 20.08.2014 | LV | 20.08.2014 | MC | 20.08.2014 | MK | 20.08.2014 | MT | 20.08.2014 | NL | 20.08.2014 | PL | 20.08.2014 | RO | 20.08.2014 | RS | 20.08.2014 | SI | 20.08.2014 | SK | 20.08.2014 | SM | 20.08.2014 | TR | 20.08.2014 | BG | 20.11.2014 | NO | 20.11.2014 | GR | 21.11.2014 | IS | 20.12.2014 | PT | 22.12.2014 | IE | 08.03.2015 | LU | 08.03.2015 | BE | 31.03.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 08.03.2013 | |
AT | 20.08.2014 | ||
CY | 20.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
MK | 20.08.2014 | ||
MT | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
SM | 20.08.2014 | ||
TR | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
IE | 08.03.2015 | ||
LU | 08.03.2015 | ||
BE | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | HU | 08.03.2013 | |
AT | 20.08.2014 | ||
CY | 20.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
MT | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
TR | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
IE | 08.03.2015 | ||
LU | 08.03.2015 | ||
BE | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
MT | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
IE | 08.03.2015 | ||
LU | 08.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
IE | 08.03.2015 | ||
LU | 08.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
LU | 08.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
LU | 08.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | FI | 20.08.2014 | |
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 20.08.2014 | |
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 20.08.2014 | |
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 20.08.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [T]EP2458340 (SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC IND SAS [FR]) [T] * the whole document *; | [AD]US2010007219 (DE BUDA ERIC GEORGE [CA], et al) [AD] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2009123586 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO02091680 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2010007219 |