EP2636308 - Assembly and method for moulding a dough portion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.10.2014 [2014/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kaak, Johan Hendrik Bernard Rijksweg 273 7011 DZ Gaanderen / NL | [2013/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Vugt, Antonius Wilhelmus Adrianus Josephus Voordijk 1 5251 VD VLIJMEN / NL | 02 /
Benders, Koen Nieuwstraat 55 5298 CK LIEMPDE / NL | [2013/37] | Representative(s) | Peters, Sebastian Martinus Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade B.V. Koninginnegracht 19 2514 AB Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | Peters, Sebastian Martinus Octrooibureau Vriesendorp & Gaade B.V. Dr. Kuyperstraat 6 2514 BB Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 13158392.4 | 08.03.2013 | [2013/37] | Priority number, date | NL20122008432 | 08.03.2012 Original published format: NL 2008432 | NL20122008552 | 27.03.2012 Original published format: NL 2008552 | [2013/37] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2636308 | Date: | 11.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A21C3/06, A21C7/01 | [2013/37] | CPC: |
A21C3/06 (EP);
A21C7/01 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Formen eines Teigstücks | [2013/37] | English: | Assembly and method for moulding a dough portion | [2013/37] | French: | Dispositif et méthode pour former une portion de pâte | [2013/37] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/43] | 09.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB425067 (FRIDOLIN WINKLER) [A] 1-5,11,13-15 * figures 1-5 * * page 3, line 28 - line 48 * * page 5, line 20 - line 25 *; | [A]EP0377964 (TWEEDY OF BURNLEY LTD [GB]) [A] 1-3,10,11,13,15 * figure 1 * * column 4, line 7 - line 35 *; | [AD]GB1328790 (TWEEDY OF BURNLEY LTD) [AD] 1,7,8,10,11 * figure . * * page 1, line 66 - page 2, line 27 *; | [A]GB116316 (BLACKLEDGE JAMES) [A] 1,7,8,11 * figures 1-3 * * page 3, line 21 - line 34 *; | [A]WO2005070215 (KAAK JOHAN H B [NL], et al) [A] 1,9 * figures 1, 2 * * page 4, line 18 - page 5, line 19 * | by applicant | GB1328790 |