EP2653693 - Combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.11.2014 [2014/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/28] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/43] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Böhm, Martin Parkstrasse 8 82343 Pöcking / DE | 02 /
Rubbert, Stephan Birkenstrasse 7R 85757 Karlsfeld / DE | 03 /
Schünemann, Erik Sailerstr. 20 80809 München / DE | [2013/43] | Application number, filing date | 13158506.9 | 11.03.2013 | [2013/43] | Priority number, date | DE201210206242 | 17.04.2012 Original published format: DE102012206242 | [2013/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2653693 | Date: | 23.10.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F02B47/02, F02M25/03 | [2013/43] | CPC: |
F02B47/02 (EP);
F02M25/03 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Brennkraftmaschine | [2013/43] | English: | Combustion engine | [2013/43] | French: | Moteur à combustion interne | [2013/43] | Examination procedure | 24.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/47] | 25.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008127931 (KUO TANG-WEI [US]) [X] 1-4,6,7 * abstract * * paragraph [0028] * * figure - * [I] 5,8; | [X]EP1736647 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,6-8 * paragraphs [0176] - [0181] *; | [X]JP2008175078 (NISSAN MOTOR) [X] 1-4,6-8 * paragraphs [0063] - [0065] * * figures 12, 13 *; | [A]US6311651 (SINGH SATNARINE [TT]) [A] 5 * column 4, lines 39-63 *; | [A]US2007022977 (CROWER H B [US]) [A] 2 * paragraph [0068] *; | [A]WO2010036093 (PETROLIAM NASIONAL BERHAD [MY], et al) [A] 1-8 * page 6, line 23 - page 7, line 10 * |