EP2604184 - Method and apparatus for determining the circumference of a portion of a body segment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/25] | Method for determining the circumference of a portion of a body segment | ||
[2019/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renal Research Institute, LLC 207 East 94th Street, Suite 303 New York, NY 10128 / US | [2013/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Levin, Nathan W. 181 East 90th Street Apartment 7B New York, NY 10128 / US | 02 /
Zhu, Fansan 43-73 Union Street, Apartment 4D New York, NY New York NY 11355 / US | [2013/32] |
Former [2013/25] | 01 /
Levin, Nathan W. 200 East 89th Street, Apartment 17B New York, NY New York NY 10128 / US | ||
02 /
Zhu, Fansan 43-73 Union Street, Apartment 4D New York, NY New York NY 11355 / US | Representative(s) | Graham Watt & Co LLP St. Botolph's House 7-9 St. Botolph's Road Sevenoaks TN13 3AJ / GB | [2019/30] |
Former [2014/46] | Suèr, Steven Johannes, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St. Botolph's House 7-9 St. Botolph's Road Sevenoaks TN13 3AJ / GB | ||
Former [2013/25] | Greenwood, John David, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13158614.1 | 10.09.2004 | [2013/25] | Priority number, date | US20030502483P | 12.09.2003 Original published format: US 502483 P | US20040580166P | 16.06.2004 Original published format: US 580166 P | US20040587652P | 14.07.2004 Original published format: US 587652 P | [2013/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2604184 | Date: | 19.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2604184 | Date: | 24.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/05, A61B5/107 | [2013/25] | CPC: |
A61B5/0537 (EP,US);
A61B5/05 (KR);
A61B5/055 (EP,US);
A61B5/4872 (EP,US);
A61B5/4881 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0223 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/30] |
Former [2013/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Bestimmung des Umfangs eines Teils eines Körpersegments | [2019/09] | English: | Method and apparatus for determining the circumference of a portion of a body segment | [2019/09] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour déterminer la circonférence d'une partie d'un segment du corps | [2019/09] |
Former [2013/25] | Verfahren zur Bestimmung des Umfangs eines Teils eines Körpersegments | ||
Former [2013/25] | Method for determining the circumference of a portion of a body segment | ||
Former [2013/25] | Méthode pour déterminer la circonférence d'une partie d'un segment du corps | Examination procedure | 11.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/04] | 09.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04783794.3 / EP1662993 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040783794) is 08.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 22.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 21.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.09.2004 | AT | 24.07.2019 | CY | 24.07.2019 | CZ | 24.07.2019 | DK | 24.07.2019 | EE | 24.07.2019 | ES | 24.07.2019 | FI | 24.07.2019 | IT | 24.07.2019 | MC | 24.07.2019 | NL | 24.07.2019 | PL | 24.07.2019 | RO | 24.07.2019 | SE | 24.07.2019 | SI | 24.07.2019 | SK | 24.07.2019 | TR | 24.07.2019 | IE | 10.09.2019 | LU | 10.09.2019 | BE | 30.09.2019 | CH | 30.09.2019 | LI | 30.09.2019 | BG | 24.10.2019 | GR | 25.10.2019 | PT | 25.11.2019 | [2021/33] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
CY | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IE | 10.09.2019 | ||
LU | 10.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IE | 10.09.2019 | ||
LU | 10.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IE | 10.09.2019 | ||
LU | 10.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LU | 10.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 24.07.2019 | |
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | NL | 24.07.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5335667 (CHA KICHUL [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 8 - line 14 * * column 3, line 25 - column 3, line 37 * * column 11, line 1 - line 12 ** figure 5 *; | [A]US6615077 (ZHU FANSAN [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 33 - column 4, line 6 * * column 9, line 24 - line 59 * * figures 2,10 * | by applicant | - K.S. COLE; R.H. COLE, "Dispersion and absorption in dielectrics. I. Alternating current characteristics", J. CHEM. PHYS., (1941), vol. 9, pages 341 - 351 | - H.P. SCHWAN; K. LI, "A dielectric study of the low-conductance surface membrane", E. COLI NATURE, (1956), vol. 177, pages 134 - 135 | - R.P. PATTERSON, "Fundamentals of impedance cardiography", IEEE ENGINEERING IN MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY MAGAZINE., (1989), vol. 8, pages 16 - 18 | - "Electrical properties of emulsions", T. HANAI, Emulsion Science, ACADEMIC, (1968), pages 354 - 477 | - A. DE LORENZO; A. ANDREOLI; J.R. MATTHIE; P.O. WITHERS, "Predicting body cell mass with bioimpedance by using theoretical methods: a technological review", J APPL PHYSIOL, (1997), vol. 82, pages 1542 - 1558, XP002673463 | - R.N. BAUMGARTNER; R. ROSS; S.B. HEYMSFIELD, "Does adipose tissue influence bioelectric impedance in obese men and women?", J APPL. PHYSIOL., (1998), vol. 84, pages 257 - 262, XP002577088 | - K.R. FOSTER; H.C. LUKASKI, "Whole-body impedance-what does it measure?", AM J CLIN NUTR, (1996), vol. 64, pages 388S - 396S | - F. ZHU; S. SARKAR; C. KAITWATCHARACHAI; R. GREENWOOD; C. RONCO; N.W. LEVIN, "Methods and reproducibility of measurement of resistivity in the calf using regional bioimpedance analysis.", BLOOD PURIF, (2003), vol. 21, pages 131 - 136 | - 4000B Bio-Impedance Spectrum Analyzer System Operating Manual, XITRON TECHNOLOGIES, INC., (1995), pages 50 - 61 |