EP2645081 - Density measuring system and density measuring method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.08.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.09.2020 [2020/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Azbil Corporation 2-7-3 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6419 / JP | [2013/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ooishi, Yasuharu c/o Azbil Corporation 2-7-3, Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6419 / JP | [2013/40] | Representative(s) | Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/40] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13158707.3 | 12.03.2013 | [2013/40] | Priority number, date | JP20120072283 | 27.03.2012 Original published format: JP 2012072283 | [2013/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2645081 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2645081 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01N9/00, G06F17/10, G06F17/18 | [2017/50] | CPC: |
G01N9/00 (EP,US);
G06F17/10 (US);
G06F17/18 (US)
|
Former IPC [2013/40] | G01N9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Dichtemesssystem und Dichtemessverfahren | [2013/40] | English: | Density measuring system and density measuring method | [2013/40] | French: | Système de mesure de densité et procédé de mesure de densité | [2013/40] | Examination procedure | 25.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.04.2020 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP2503318 (AZBIL CORP [JP]) [XP] 1-16 * paragraphs [0060] , [0061] , [0074] , [0079] , [0080] , [0082] , [0086] *; | [X]EP2381248 (YAMATAKE CORP [JP]) [X] 1,5,9,13 * paragraphs [0157] , [0158]; figure 23 * | by applicant | JPH10281967 | JPH05141999 |