EP2607939 - Interference filter, optical module, and analyzing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.04.2017 [2017/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [2013/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shinto, Susumu c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano, 392-8502 / JP | 02 /
Kitahara, Koji c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano, 392-8502 / JP | [2013/26] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/26] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13158748.7 | 20.07.2011 | [2013/26] | Priority number, date | JP20100165587 | 23.07.2010 Original published format: JP 2010165587 | [2013/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2607939 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2607939 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G02B26/00, G02B5/28, C22C5/06, C22C5/08 | [2013/26] | CPC: |
G02B26/001 (EP,US);
G02B5/28 (KR);
C22C5/06 (EP,US);
C22C5/08 (EP,US);
G01J1/0488 (US);
G01J3/46 (US);
G02B5/284 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/26] | Title | German: | Interferenzfilter, optisches Modul und Analysevorrichtung | [2013/26] | English: | Interference filter, optical module, and analyzing device | [2013/26] | French: | Filtre d'interférences, module optique et dispositif d'analyse | [2013/26] | Examination procedure | 24.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/45] | 09.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/16] | 14.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/16] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11174643.4 / EP2410368 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20110174643) is 15.10.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2010142067 (HANAMURA YUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,3,4,6-8 * figures 2,11 * * paragraphs [0012] , [0055] , [0056] , [0099] *; | [Y]JP2009251105 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [Y] 1,3-5,8 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0016] , [0031] , [0036] *; | [Y]US2006134367 (NEE HAN H [US]) [Y] 1,3-8 * paragraphs [0031] , [0081] , [0093] , [0123] *; | [Y]US2004028912 (TAUCHI YUUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,3-8 * paragraphs [0028] , [0032] , [0064] , [0140] *; | [Y]EP1612784 (KOBE STEEL LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,3-8 * paragraphs [0001] , [0029] , [0032] , [0033] , [0034] * | by applicant | JP2009251105 |