EP2604604 - Benzofuranyl derivatives used as glucokinase inhibitors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.12.2014 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.01.2015 [2015/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfizer Inc. 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017 / US | [2013/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ling, Anthony Lai 11314 Breckenridge Way San Diego, CA California 92131 / US | 02 /
Pfefferkorn, Jeffrey Allen Pfizer Global Research and Development Eastern Point Road Groton, CT Connecticut 06340 / US | [2013/25] | Representative(s) | Pfizer European Patent Department 23-25 avenue du Docteur Lannelongue 75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | [2013/25] | Application number, filing date | 13158856.8 | 04.03.2010 | [2013/25] | Priority number, date | US20090159099P | 11.03.2009 Original published format: US 159099 P | [2013/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2604604 | Date: | 19.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07D405/14, A61K31/506, A61K31/497, A61P3/10, A61P3/04 | [2013/25] | CPC: |
C07D405/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/497 (KR);
A61K31/506 (KR);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/25] | Extension states | AL | 19.12.2013 | BA | 19.12.2013 | ME | 19.12.2013 | RS | 19.12.2013 | Title | German: | Als Glucokinaseinhibitoren verwendete Benzofuranylderivate | [2013/25] | English: | Benzofuranyl derivatives used as glucokinase inhibitors | [2013/25] | French: | Dérivés de benzofuranyle utilisés comme inhibiteurs de la glucokinase | [2013/25] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/06] | 13.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/05] | 19.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/05] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10708644.9 / EP2406253 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO2004046139 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [AD] 1-10 * claims 1,8 *; | [AD]WO2007043638 (ASTELLAS PHARMA INC [JP], et al) [AD] 1-10 * abstract *; | [I]WO2007122482 (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al) [I] 1-10 * page 193-195; page 1, paragraph 1; examples 277-279 *; | [A] - SARABU R ET AL, "Glucokinase activators as new type 2 diabetes therapeutic agents", EXPERT OPINION ON THERAPEUTIC PATENTS 200807 GB,, (20080701), vol. 18, no. 7, doi:10.1517/13543776.18.7.759, pages 759 - 768, XP002554141 [A] 1-10 * Compound 19 on page 764 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/13543776.18.7.759 |