EP2645240 - Method for automatically updating a computer system and device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.10.2016 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2014/21] |
Former [2013/40] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kröselberg, Dirk Pestalozzistrasse 27 80469 München / DE | 02 /
Lukas, Klaus Niemöllerallee 6 81739 München / DE | [2013/40] | Application number, filing date | 13159323.8 | 15.03.2013 | [2013/40] | Priority number, date | DE201210204804 | 26.03.2012 Original published format: DE102012204804 | [2013/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2645240 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2645240 | Date: | 06.08.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/10, G06F9/44 | [2014/32] | CPC: |
G06F8/65 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/40] | G06F9/44, G06F21/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zum automatischen Aktualisieren eines Computersystems und Vorrichtung | [2013/40] | English: | Method for automatically updating a computer system and device | [2013/40] | French: | Procédé d'actualisation automatique d'un système informatique et dispositif | [2013/40] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/09] | 29.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/48] | 15.06.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/48] | 12.07.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.06.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [L] - "STATEMENT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE NOTICE FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE DATED 1 OCTOBER 2007 CONCERNING BUSINESS METHODS - EPC / ERKLAERUNG GEMAESS DER MITTEILUNG DES EUROPAEISCHEN PATENTAMTS VOM 1.OKTOBER 2007 UEBER GESCHAEFTSMETHODEN - EPU / DECLARATION CONFORMEMENT AU COMMUNIQUE DE L'OFFICE EUROP", 20071101, (20071101), XP002456252 [L] 1-14 |