EP2680277 - Chip resistor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.2014 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.01.2015 [2015/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ralec Electronic Corporation 1, Central 2nd St., N.E.P.Z. 811 Kaohsiung / TW | [2014/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Full No. 31, Alley 2, Lane 57, Binhai 1st Road Gushan Dist. 804 Kaohsiung City / TW | [2014/01] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/01] | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann Stöckeler, Zinkler & Partner Postfach 246 82043 Pullach / DE | Application number, filing date | 13159735.3 | 18.03.2013 | [2014/01] | Priority number, date | TW20120212157 | 25.06.2012 Original published format: TW 101212157 | [2014/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2680277 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01C1/08, H01C1/084, H01C7/00 | [2014/01] | CPC: |
H01C1/084 (EP,KR,US);
H01C1/08 (EP,US);
H01C1/14 (KR);
H01C7/003 (EP,KR,US);
H05K3/3442 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Chipwiderstand | [2014/01] | English: | Chip resistor | [2014/01] | French: | Résistance SMD | [2014/01] | Examination procedure | 02.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/04] | 07.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/04] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2009322467 (HETZLER ULLRICH [DE]) [X] 1-3,7,8 * paragraphs [0048] - [0064]; figures 1-5 * [I] 4-6; | [XI]US2011057766 (CHEN CHING-FENG [TW], et al) [X] 1,4,6-8 * paragraphs [0023] - [0034]; figures 2-6 * [I] 2,3,5; | [A]US2003041442 (MCCULLOUGH KEVIN A [US]) [A] 4,5 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] * |