EP2610289 - Foamed, in particular pressure-sensitive adhesive, method for preparation as well as the use of the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.10.2014 [2014/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states tesa SE Hugo-Kirchberg-Straße 1 22848 Norderstedt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/45] | For all designated states Tesa SE Quickbornstraße 24 20253 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2013/27] | For all designated states tesa AG Quickbornstraße 24 20253 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Czerwonatis, Franziska Grotelerweg 62 21075 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
Burmeister Axel Vogt Kölln Str. 23 22527 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
Bhandari, Sabine, Dr. Am Dalmannkai 16 20457 Hamburg / DE | 04 /
Kreft, Christian Rombergstraße 7 20255 Hamburg / DE | 05 /
Bünz, Stephan Spanngrund 55 25746 Ostrohe / DE | [2013/27] | Application number, filing date | 13159970.6 | 06.01.2009 | [2013/27] | Priority number, date | DE20081004388 | 14.01.2008 Original published format: DE102008004388 | [2013/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2610289 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2610289 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/32, B29C70/66, C09J107/00, C09J109/02, C09J109/06, C09J123/02, C09J123/08, C09J123/22, C09J201/00, // C08K7/22 | [2013/27] | CPC: |
C08J9/32 (EP,US);
C09J11/00 (KR);
B29B7/426 (EP);
B29B7/485 (EP,US);
B29B7/487 (EP,US);
B29B7/7461 (EP,US);
B29B7/748 (EP);
B29B7/7495 (EP,US);
B29C43/24 (EP);
B29C43/28 (EP);
B29C48/0011 (EP);
B29C48/154 (EP);
B29C48/385 (EP);
B29C48/40 (EP);
B29C48/44 (EP);
B29C48/92 (EP);
B29C70/606 (EP,US);
B29C70/66 (EP,US);
C08K7/22 (EP,US);
C08L53/02 (EP,US);
C08L55/02 (EP,US);
C09J107/00 (US);
C09J11/08 (EP,US);
C09J121/00 (EP,US);
C09J123/02 (EP,US);
C09J123/0853 (EP,US);
C09J133/10 (US);
C09J153/02 (EP,US);
C09J155/02 (EP,US);
C09J201/00 (KR);
C09J7/38 (EP,US);
C09J9/00 (KR);
B29B7/826 (EP,US);
B29B7/90 (EP,US);
B29C2948/92704 (EP);
B29K2105/0097 (US);
B29K2105/165 (EP,US);
B29L2007/005 (EP,US);
C08G2170/40 (EP,US);
C08J2201/024 (EP,US);
C08J2203/22 (US);
C08J2207/02 (EP,US);
C08J2307/00 (US);
C08J2333/10 (US);
C08J2353/02 (US);
C08L2205/20 (EP,US);
C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L2666/06 (EP,US);
C09J2301/408 (EP,US);
C09J2301/412 (EP,US);
Y10T428/28 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2839 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K7/22, C08L21/00 (US,EP);
C08L53/02, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L55/02, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C09J123/02, C08L2666/06 (EP,US);
C09J123/0853, C08L2666/06 (EP,US);
C09J153/02, C08L2666/02 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/27] | Title | German: | Geschäumte, insbesondere druckempfindliche Klebemasse, Verfahren zur Herstellung sowie die Verwendung derselben | [2013/27] | English: | Foamed, in particular pressure-sensitive adhesive, method for preparation as well as the use of the same | [2013/27] | French: | Masse de collage expansée, notamment sensible à la pression, son procédé de fabrication et son utilisation | [2013/27] | Examination procedure | 30.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/24] | 01.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/43] | 04.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2014/43] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09702394.9 / EP2235098 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0257984 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1-13 * examples 33,43,44,56,57,64,65 *; | [X]US2006173087 (HYDE PATRICK D [US], et al) [X] 1-13* paragraphs [0068] - [0073]; claims 10,14,19,20 *; | [X]US2006177652 (KHANDPUR ASHISH K [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0035] - [0040] - [0052] , [0053] , [0073] - [0085]; claims 1,3,4 *; | [X]US2007014984 (STOUT GEORGE M [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0020] , [0027] - [0030] * | by applicant | DE2105877 | DE3537433 | EP0257984 | WO9531225 | WO9532851 | EP0693097 | WO9818878 | DE19730854 | EP1102809 |