EP2698355 - Paste composition for solar cell electrode, electrode prepared using the same, and solar cell comprising the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.02.2015 [2015/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHEIL INDUSTRIES INC. 290 Gongdan-dong Gumi-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 730-710 / KR | [2014/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Eun Kyung Cheil Industries Inc. 332-2 Gocheon-dong Uiwang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Choi, Young Wook Cheil Industries Inc. 332-2 Gocheon-dong 332-2 Uiwang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Song, Hun Gyu Cheil Industries Inc. 332-2 Gocheon-dong Uiwang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Lee, Jung Chul Cheil Industries Inc. 332-2 Gocheon-dong Uiwang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2014/08] | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/08] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte Speditionstraße 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 13160017.3 | 19.03.2013 | [2014/08] | Priority number, date | KR20120088408 | 13.08.2012 Original published format: KR 20120088408 | [2014/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2698355 | Date: | 19.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C03C8/10, C03C8/16, C03C8/18, H01B1/22 | [2014/08] | CPC: |
H01L31/022425 (EP,US);
H01B1/22 (EP,KR,US);
C03C3/122 (EP,US);
C03C8/10 (EP,US);
C03C8/16 (EP,US);
C03C8/18 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Pastenzusammensetzung für Solarzellenelektrode, Elektrode, die zur Verwendung davon hergestellt ist und Solarzelle damit | [2014/08] | English: | Paste composition for solar cell electrode, electrode prepared using the same, and solar cell comprising the same | [2014/08] | French: | Pâte pour électrode de cellule solaire, électrode lýutilisant et cellule solaire le comprenant | [2014/08] | Examination procedure | 20.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/07] | 17.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/07] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2011232746 (CARROLL ALAN FREDERICK [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * example 16; claim - *; | [A]JPH02124745 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]JPH01138150 (OHARA KK) [A] 1-11 * abstract * |