EP2641698 - Power tool comprising a return means exerting a decreasing return effort on the actuation means when said actuation means is moved into the active position thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.2018 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.08.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Etablissements Georges Renault Zac De La Lorie 38 Rue Bobby Sands 44800 Saint Herblain / FR | [2013/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tariot, Samuel 1 impasse des Iris 85710 BOIS DE CENE / FR | [2013/39] | Representative(s) | Vidon Brevets & Stratégie 16B, rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/06] | Vidon Brevets & Stratégie 16B, rue de Jouanet B.P. 90333 Technopole Atalante 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | ||
Former [2013/39] | Provost, Antoine Cabinet Vidon Technopôle Atalante 16B, rue de Jouanet 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | Application number, filing date | 13160252.6 | 20.03.2013 | [2013/39] | Priority number, date | FR20120052656 | 23.03.2012 Original published format: FR 1252656 | [2013/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2641698 | Date: | 25.09.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2641698 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2641698 | Date: | 07.02.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B25B21/00, B25F5/00 | [2013/39] | CPC: |
B25F5/00 (EP);
B25B21/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/09] |
Former [2013/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Motorisiertes Werkzeug, das Rückholmittel umfasst, die auf die Bedienungsmittel eine abnehmende Rückholkraft ausüben, wenn diese Bedienungsmittel in ihre Aktivierungsposition verschoben werden | [2013/39] | English: | Power tool comprising a return means exerting a decreasing return effort on the actuation means when said actuation means is moved into the active position thereof | [2013/39] | French: | Outil motorisé comprenant des moyens de rappel exerçant sur les moyens d'actionnement un effort de rappel décroissant lorsque ces moyens d'actionnement sont déplacés vers leur position d'activation | [2013/39] | Examination procedure | 15.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/09] | 01.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.09.2016 | Opposition(s) | 08.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.03.2013 | AL | 07.02.2018 | AT | 07.02.2018 | CY | 07.02.2018 | CZ | 07.02.2018 | DK | 07.02.2018 | EE | 07.02.2018 | ES | 07.02.2018 | FI | 07.02.2018 | HR | 07.02.2018 | IT | 07.02.2018 | LT | 07.02.2018 | LV | 07.02.2018 | MC | 07.02.2018 | MK | 07.02.2018 | MT | 07.02.2018 | NL | 07.02.2018 | PL | 07.02.2018 | PT | 07.02.2018 | RO | 07.02.2018 | RS | 07.02.2018 | SE | 07.02.2018 | SI | 07.02.2018 | SK | 07.02.2018 | SM | 07.02.2018 | TR | 07.02.2018 | IE | 20.03.2018 | LU | 20.03.2018 | BE | 31.03.2018 | CH | 31.03.2018 | LI | 31.03.2018 | BG | 07.05.2018 | NO | 07.05.2018 | GR | 08.05.2018 | IS | 07.06.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 20.03.2013 | |
AL | 07.02.2018 | ||
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
MT | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PT | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
TR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IE | 20.03.2018 | ||
LU | 20.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
MT | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
TR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IE | 20.03.2018 | ||
LU | 20.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
MT | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
IE | 20.03.2018 | ||
LU | 20.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
MT | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
IE | 20.03.2018 | ||
LU | 20.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
MT | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
LU | 20.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
MT | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MT | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MT | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MT | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MT | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 07.02.2018 | |
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MT | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 07.02.2018 | |
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 07.02.2018 | |
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 07.02.2018 | |
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 07.02.2018 | |
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 07.02.2018 | |
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002069730 (LEHNERT MARK W [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0028] *; | [A]US2007114049 (STEVERDING JAMES F [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0038] , [0 43] - [0047] * |