EP2607395 - Block copolymers of acrylates and methacrylates with fluoroalkenes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.02.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abbott Cardiovascular Systems Inc. 3200 Lakeside Drive Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | [2013/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Claude, Charles, D. 3250 W. Kiltie Lane Flagstaff, AZ Arizona 86001 / US | [2013/26] | Representative(s) | ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Rambla Catalunya, 123 08008 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2015/14] | ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Plaza Catalunya, 1 08002 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [2013/26] | ZBM Patents Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Plaza Catalunya, 1 08002 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 13160528.9 | 10.11.2004 | [2013/26] | Priority number, date | US20030714111 | 14.11.2003 Original published format: US 714111 | [2013/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2607395 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2607395 | Date: | 01.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08F293/00, C09D153/00, C08L53/00, A61L31/10, A61L27/34, A61L29/08, A61L27/54, A61L31/16 | [2014/43] | CPC: |
A61L31/10 (EP,US);
A61K31/436 (EP,US);
A61K47/32 (US);
A61L27/34 (EP,US);
A61L27/54 (EP,US);
A61L31/16 (EP,US);
C08F293/00 (EP,US);
C08F293/005 (EP,US);
C08L53/00 (EP,US);
C09D153/00 (EP,US);
A61L2300/416 (EP,US);
A61L2420/00 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61L27/34, C08L53/00 (US,EP);
A61L31/10, C08L53/00 (US,EP);
C08L53/00, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C09D153/00, C08L2666/02 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2013/26] | C08F293/00, C09D153/00, C08L53/00, A61L31/10, A61L27/34, A61L29/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/26] | Title | German: | Blockcopolymere aus Methacrylaten mit Fluoroalkenen | [2014/44] | English: | Block copolymers of acrylates and methacrylates with fluoroalkenes | [2013/26] | French: | Copolymeres a blocs à base de methacrylates et acrylates avec fluoralcenes | [2014/44] |
Former [2013/26] | Blockcopolymere aus Methacrylaten mit Fluoroalkenen | ||
Former [2013/26] | Copolymeres a blocs à base de methacrylates et acrylates avec fluoralcenes | Examination procedure | 20.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/08] | 02.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04800949.2 / EP1682593 | Divisional application(s) | EP15157882.0 / EP2915829 | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.11.2004 | AT | 01.04.2015 | BE | 01.04.2015 | BG | 01.04.2015 | CY | 01.04.2015 | CZ | 01.04.2015 | DK | 01.04.2015 | EE | 01.04.2015 | FI | 01.04.2015 | MC | 01.04.2015 | PL | 01.04.2015 | RO | 01.04.2015 | SE | 01.04.2015 | SI | 01.04.2015 | SK | 01.04.2015 | TR | 01.04.2015 | GR | 02.07.2015 | IS | 01.08.2015 | PT | 03.08.2015 | LU | 10.11.2015 | CH | 30.11.2015 | LI | 30.11.2015 | [2018/33] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 10.11.2004 | |
AT | 01.04.2015 | ||
BE | 01.04.2015 | ||
BG | 01.04.2015 | ||
CY | 01.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SE | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
LU | 10.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
BE | 01.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
LU | 10.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
LU | 10.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
LU | 10.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 01.04.2015 | |
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0489370 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * page 5, lines 17-29; example -; claim - *; | [Y]WO0059963 (UNIV GENT [BE], et al) [Y] 6-8 * example -; claims 1-3,9,10 *; | [XDY] - ZHANG Z ET AL, "Synthesis of fluorine-containing block copolymers via ATRP 1. Synthesis and characterization of PSt-PVDF-PSt triblock copolymers", POLYMER, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V, GB, vol. 40, no. 5, ISSN 0032-3861, (19990301), pages 1341 - 1345, (19990301), XP027122991 [XD] 1-5,9,10 * the whole document * [Y] 6-8 | [XDY] - YING S ET AL, "SYNTHESIS OF ABA TRIBLOCK COPOLYMERS CONTAINING BOTH FLUOROCARBON AND HYDROCARBON BLOCKS FOR COMPATIBLIZERS", POLYMER PREPRINTS, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (19980101), vol. 39, no. 2, ISSN 0032-3934, page 843/844, XP009070832 [XD] 1-5,9,10 * the whole document * [Y] 6-8 | [AD] - SILVANA MODENA ET AL, "Radical telomerization of vinylidene fluoride in the presence of 1,2-dibromotetrafluoroethane", JOURNAL OF FLUORINE CHEMISTRY, (19890401), vol. 43, no. 1, doi:10.1016/S0022-1139(00)81633-4, ISSN 0022-1139, pages 15 - 25, XP055063074 [AD] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-1139(00)81633-4 | by applicant | - MATYJASZEWSKI, K., Controlled Radical Polymerization, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1998), vol. 685 | - HONIGFORT, M. E.; BRITTAIN, W. J.; BOSANAC, T.; WILCOX, C. S., POLYM. PREPR., (2002), vol. 43, page 561 | - YING ET AL., POLYM. PREPRINTS, (1998), vol. 39, no. 2, page 843 | - ZHANG ET AL., POLYMER, (1999), vol. 40, page 1341 | - MODENA ET AL., J. FLUORINE CHEM., (1989), page 4315 | - MODENA ET AL., JFLUORINE CHEM., (1989), vol. 43, page 15 | - PERRIER ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETT, (2002), vol. 58, page 4053 | - JO ET AL., POLYM BULL (BERLIN, (2002), vol. 44, page 1 |