EP2644986 - Downlight fixtures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.10.2014 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.11.2014 [2014/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABL IP Holding LLC One Lithonia Way Conyers GA 30012 / US | [2013/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clifton, David Wiley 301 Bridgewood Drive Conyers, GA Georgia 30094 / US | 02 /
Bell, Larry Michael 701 Brooks Woolsey Road Brooks, GA Georgia 30205 / US | 03 /
Kruse, Glen Andrew 940 Cranbrook Glen Lane Snellville, GA Georgia 30078 / US | 04 /
Grove, Douglas Dewayne 866 Coopers Ridge Path Grayson, GA Georgia 30017 / US | 05 /
Rodriguez, Yan 7110 Grand View Way Suwanee, GA Georgia 30024 / US | [2013/40] | Representative(s) | Thompson, Andrew John, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/40] | Thompson, Andrew John, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 13161469.5 | 27.03.2013 | [2013/40] | Priority number, date | US201261685924P | 27.03.2012 Original published format: US 201261685924 P | [2013/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2644986 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F21V21/04, F21S8/02, // F21Y101/02 | [2013/40] | CPC: |
F21S8/026 (EP,US);
F21V15/04 (US);
F21V19/00 (US);
F21V21/044 (EP,US);
F21V29/507 (EP,US);
F21V29/70 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Downlight-Befestigungen | [2013/40] | English: | Downlight fixtures | [2013/40] | French: | Appareils d'éclairage à flux dirigé vers le bas | [2013/40] | Examination procedure | 03.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/46] | 18.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/46] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPS56116204 (TOSHIBA ELECTRIC EQUIP) [X] 1,3,5-7,9,12-15 * figures 2-4 * [I] 2,4,8,10; | [XI]US5068772 (SHAPIRO JAMES [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,9,14,15 * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 3 * * column 5, line 16 - line 24 * * figures 1-3, 8-11 * [I] 4,8,12,13; | [XI]US2004257818 (BENGHOZI SIMON-VICTOR [CA]) [X] 1,3,5-9,12,13 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0031] * * figures 1-5 * [I] 2,4,14,15; | [XI]JP2008059815 (HIKARI DENKI SEISAKUSHO KK) [X] 1,3,5-7,9,10,12-15 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * [I] 2,4,8; | [A]US2010110699 (CHOU DER JEOU [US]) [A] 1-8,12,14,15 * figures 2b, 3,15a-c ** paragraphs [0036] , [0081] *; | [XPI]EP2463578 (ANTARES ILUMINACION SA [ES]) [XP] 1-3,5-9,12,14,15 * the whole document * [I] 4,10,13 |