EP2784790 - Pressure relief device for a power transformer, and related power transformer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.10.2015 [2015/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Technology AG Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | [2014/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tonin, Andrea Via G. Garibaldi, 23 36070 Brogliano (VI) / IT | 02 /
Carollo, Carlo Via San Benedetto, 13 36016 Thiene (VI) / IT | 03 /
Ramponi, Emanuele Via Tito Livio 15/3 36071 Arzignano (VI) / IT | [2014/40] | Representative(s) | De Santis, Giovanni ABB S.p.A. Via L. Lama, 33 20099 Sesto San Giovanni (MI) / IT | [2014/40] | Application number, filing date | 13161665.8 | 28.03.2013 | [2014/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2784790 | Date: | 01.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01F27/14, H01F27/40 | [2014/40] | CPC: |
H01F27/14 (EP);
F16K17/0413 (EP);
F16K27/02 (EP);
H01F27/402 (EP);
H01F2027/404 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Druckentlastungsvorrichtung für einen Stromtransformator und zugehöriger Stromtransformator | [2014/40] | English: | Pressure relief device for a power transformer, and related power transformer | [2014/40] | French: | Dispositif de libération de pression pour transformateur de puissance et transformateur de puissance associé | [2014/40] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2013 | Examination requested [2014/40] | 02.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/43] | 12.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CN202420748U (TIANWEI YUNNAN TRANSFORMER CO LTD) [X] 1,9-11 * figure 1 * * corresponding description * [I] 2-8; | [XI]CN2805038Y (YANG HAIQUN [CN]) [X] 1,9-11 * figure 1 * * corresponding description * [I] 2-8; | [XI]CN201973308U (CHINA XD ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1,9-11 * figure 1 * * corresponding description * [I] 2-8; | [XI]CN201215201Y (SHENYANG STI ELECTRICAL SCIENC [CN]) [X] 1,9-11 * figures 1-3 * * corresponding description * [I] 2-8; | [XI]CN2636020Y (XINJIANG TEBIAN ELECTRIC CO LT [CN]) [X] 1,9-11 * figures 2,3 * * corresponding description * [I] 2-8; | [A]EP2520836 (ABB TECHNOLOGY AG [CH]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * |