EP2663043 - Capacitive isolated voltage domains [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.04.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2013/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shrestha, Rameswor c/o NXP B.V., Intellectual Property & Licensing Red Central 60 High Street Redhill Redhill, Surrey RH1 1SH / GB | [2013/46] | Representative(s) | Hardingham, Christopher Mark NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Group Abbey House 25 Clarendon Road Redhill, Surrey RH1 1QZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/32] | Hardingham, Christopher Mark NXP SEMICONDUCTORS Intellectual Property Group Abbey House 25 Clarendon Road Redhill, Surrey RH1 1QZ / GB | ||
Former [2013/46] | Hardingham, Christopher Mark NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property and Licensing Red Central 60 High Street Redhill, Surrey RH1 1NY / GB | Application number, filing date | 13162303.5 | 04.04.2013 | [2013/46] | Priority number, date | US201213467854 | 09.05.2012 Original published format: US201213467854 | [2013/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2663043 | Date: | 13.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2663043 | Date: | 06.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2663043 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/06, H04L25/02 | [2013/46] | CPC: |
H04L25/0268 (EP,US);
H04L27/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/46] |
Former [2013/46] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Kapazitativ isolierte Spannungsbereiche | [2013/46] | English: | Capacitive isolated voltage domains | [2013/46] | French: | Domaines de tension isolée capacitive | [2013/46] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/19] | 05.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.04.2013 | AL | 09.08.2017 | AT | 09.08.2017 | CY | 09.08.2017 | CZ | 09.08.2017 | DK | 09.08.2017 | EE | 09.08.2017 | ES | 09.08.2017 | FI | 09.08.2017 | HR | 09.08.2017 | IT | 09.08.2017 | LT | 09.08.2017 | LV | 09.08.2017 | MC | 09.08.2017 | MK | 09.08.2017 | NL | 09.08.2017 | PL | 09.08.2017 | PT | 09.08.2017 | RO | 09.08.2017 | RS | 09.08.2017 | SE | 09.08.2017 | SI | 09.08.2017 | SK | 09.08.2017 | SM | 09.08.2017 | TR | 09.08.2017 | BG | 09.11.2017 | NO | 09.11.2017 | GR | 10.11.2017 | IS | 09.12.2017 | GB | 04.04.2018 | IE | 04.04.2018 | LU | 04.04.2018 | MT | 04.04.2018 | BE | 30.04.2018 | CH | 30.04.2018 | LI | 30.04.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 04.04.2013 | |
AT | 09.08.2017 | ||
CY | 09.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
MK | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PT | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
TR | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
GB | 04.04.2018 | ||
IE | 04.04.2018 | ||
LU | 04.04.2018 | ||
MT | 04.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 04.04.2013 | |
AT | 09.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PT | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
TR | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
GB | 04.04.2018 | ||
IE | 04.04.2018 | ||
LU | 04.04.2018 | ||
MT | 04.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
TR | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
GB | 04.04.2018 | ||
IE | 04.04.2018 | ||
LU | 04.04.2018 | ||
MT | 04.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
GB | 04.04.2018 | ||
IE | 04.04.2018 | ||
LU | 04.04.2018 | ||
MT | 04.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
GB | 04.04.2018 | ||
IE | 04.04.2018 | ||
LU | 04.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
GB | 04.04.2018 | ||
LU | 04.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
LU | 04.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
IT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 09.08.2017 | |
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 09.08.2017 | |
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 09.08.2017 | |
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 09.08.2017 | |
NO | 09.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2007103205 (WHETSEL LEE D [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0050] - [0055] - [0060] , [0087] - [0093] - [0115] , [0118] * * figures 2-11,14 *; | [A]US2006132192 (YU JAE-SUK [KR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0010] , [0012] , [0013] , [0014] , [0017] , [0046] , [0052] , [0065] , [0066] * * figure 2 *; | [A]US2009243028 (DONG ZHIWEI [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0003] , [0006] , [0007] , [0009] , [0014] , [0061] , [0067] , [0114] , [0116] * * figures 4,5,6,7 *; | [A]WO2004062221 (KUNC VINKO [SI], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 2, lines 13-16 * * page 3, lines 24-26 *; | [I]US2007069768 (HATOOKA KAZUYA [JP], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0060] - [0068] * * figure 7 *; | [A]US2008218258 (CRAWLEY PHILIP JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0003] , [0019] - [0021] - [0026] , [0027] , [0045] , [0048] , [0059] , [0060] * * figures 1, 6A, 11 *; | [AD] - "ISO102 ISO106, SIGNAL ISOLATION BUFFER AMPLIFIERS", Datasheets, TUCSON, Arizona, USA, (19950102), pages 1 - 15, URL: http://pdf.datasheet4u.com/253748/ISO102.pdf, (20160222), XP055252052 [AD] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US6920576 | US6882046 |