EP2651098 - Event processing system for an electrical power system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [2018/49] |
Former [2013/42] | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Khozikov, Vyacheslav 4550 169th Ave. SE Bellevue, WA 98006 / US | 02 /
Sackman, Ronald Ward 42 Starr Way Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | 03 /
Roe, George Michael 528 North 60th Street Seattle, WA 98013 / US | [2013/42] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2018/49] |
Former [2013/42] | Witte, Weller & Partner Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 13162785.3 | 08.04.2013 | [2013/42] | Priority number, date | US201213446850 | 13.04.2012 Original published format: US201213446850 | [2013/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2651098 | Date: | 16.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2651098 | Date: | 05.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H02J13/00 | [2013/42] | CPC: |
H04L63/1441 (EP,US);
G06F21/55 (US);
H04L63/1416 (EP,US);
H04L63/1433 (US);
H04L63/20 (US);
Y04S40/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/49] |
Former [2013/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Ereignisverarbeitungssystem für ein elektrisches Stromversorgungssystem | [2013/42] | English: | Event processing system for an electrical power system | [2013/42] | French: | Système de traitement d'événement pour système d'alimentation électrique | [2013/42] | Examination procedure | 16.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/23] | 19.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.04.2013 | AL | 05.12.2018 | AT | 05.12.2018 | CY | 05.12.2018 | CZ | 05.12.2018 | DK | 05.12.2018 | EE | 05.12.2018 | ES | 05.12.2018 | FI | 05.12.2018 | HR | 05.12.2018 | LT | 05.12.2018 | LV | 05.12.2018 | MC | 05.12.2018 | MK | 05.12.2018 | MT | 05.12.2018 | NL | 05.12.2018 | PL | 05.12.2018 | RO | 05.12.2018 | RS | 05.12.2018 | SE | 05.12.2018 | SI | 05.12.2018 | SK | 05.12.2018 | SM | 05.12.2018 | TR | 05.12.2018 | BG | 05.03.2019 | NO | 05.03.2019 | GR | 06.03.2019 | IS | 05.04.2019 | PT | 05.04.2019 | IE | 08.04.2019 | LU | 08.04.2019 | BE | 30.04.2019 | CH | 30.04.2019 | LI | 30.04.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 08.04.2013 | |
AL | 05.12.2018 | ||
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CY | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
MT | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
TR | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
IE | 08.04.2019 | ||
LU | 08.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 08.04.2013 | |
AL | 05.12.2018 | ||
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CY | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
TR | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
IE | 08.04.2019 | ||
LU | 08.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CY | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
TR | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
IE | 08.04.2019 | ||
LU | 08.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
TR | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
IE | 08.04.2019 | ||
LU | 08.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
TR | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
LU | 08.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
LU | 08.04.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
LU | 08.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/02] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
MC | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SI | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
DK | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SK | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
IS | 05.04.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
EE | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RO | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
SM | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
PL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
PT | 05.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
NL | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 05.12.2018 | |
AT | 05.12.2018 | ||
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
RS | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
SE | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
GR | 06.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 05.12.2018 | |
ES | 05.12.2018 | ||
FI | 05.12.2018 | ||
HR | 05.12.2018 | ||
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
LV | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 05.12.2018 | |
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
BG | 05.03.2019 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 05.12.2018 | |
LT | 05.12.2018 | ||
NO | 05.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 05.12.2018 | |
NO | 05.03.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2008109684 (GRID NET INC [US], et al) [A] 1-10* paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0079] *; | [X]US2011288692 (SCOTT ANTHONY DAVID [US]) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0126] *; | [A] - IGOR NAI FOVINO ET AL, "Modbus/DNP3 State-Based Intrusion Detection System", ADVANCED INFORMATION NETWORKING AND APPLICATIONS (AINA), 2010 24TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100420), ISBN 978-1-4244-6695-5, pages 729 - 736, XP031682596 [A] 1-10 * Sections IV-VII * |