EP2789562 - A torque limiting coupling for a hoisting machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.2023 [2023/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONE Corporation Kartanontie 1 00330 Helsinki / FI | [2017/24] |
Former [2014/42] | For all designated states Kone Corporation Kartanontie 1 00330 Helsinki / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saarelainen, Antti Vallikatu 9 B 10 02650 Espoo / FI | 02 /
Koivisto, Kimmo Joukahaisentie 10 15870 Hollola / FI | 03 /
Lähteenmäki, Jussi Hangontie 49 C 12 05840 Hyvinkää / FI | [2014/42] | Representative(s) | Papula Oy P.O. Box 981 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2014/42] | Application number, filing date | 13163120.2 | 10.04.2013 | [2014/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2789562 | Date: | 15.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B66B11/04, B66B15/04 | [2014/42] | CPC: |
B66B15/04 (EP);
B66B11/0484 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/22] |
Former [2014/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Drehmomenteingrenzungskupplung für Hebemaschine | [2014/42] | English: | A torque limiting coupling for a hoisting machine | [2014/42] | French: | Accouplement limiteur de couple pour machine de levage | [2014/42] | Examination procedure | 15.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/22] | 10.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/06] | 27.09.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.02.2021 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2022 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB238441 (JOHN BERTRAM MORTON KNUTSEN) [X] 1-3,15 * figures 5,6 * * page 6, lines 14-111 *; | [A]DE613078 (HANS MANGELSDORFF) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1493708 (SASSI ALBERTO SPA [IT]) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [A]WO2007113374 (KONE CORP [FI], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * pages 6, 7 *; | [XI]JP2009132471 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1-7,12,13,15 * abstract * [I] 9,14; | [A]EP2574584 (INVENTIO AG [CH]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |