EP2664337 - Amniotic membrane preparations and purified compositions and methods of use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TissueTech, Inc. 7000 S.W. 97th Avenue, Suite 212 Miami Florida 33173 / US | [2019/33] |
Former [2013/47] | For all designated states TissueTech, Inc. 7000 S.W. 97th Avenue, Suite 212 Miami Florida 33173 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HE, Hua Tissue Tech, Inc. 7000 S.W. 97th Avenue, Suite 212 Miami, FL 33173 / US | 02 /
LI, Wei Tissue Tech, Inc. 7000 S.W. 97th Avenue, Suite 212 Miami, FL 33173 / US | 03 /
TSENG, Scheffer C. G. Tissue Tech, Inc. 7000 S.W. 97th Avenue, Suite 212 Miami, FL 33173 / US | [2019/33] |
Former [2013/47] | 01 /
He, Hua 7570 SW 82 St. F210 Miami, FL 33143 / US | ||
02 /
Li, Wei Songbai Road Jixin Yayuan Building A-603 Songgang Town Baoan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518105 / CN | |||
03 /
Tseng, Scheffer C. G. 10000 SW 63rd Place Pinecrest, FL 33156 / US | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/33] | HGF Limited 8th Floor 140 London Wall London EC2Y 5DN / GB | ||
Former [2013/47] | Williams, Richard Andrew Norman Harrison Goddard Foote LLP 140 London Wall London EC2Y 5DN / GB | Application number, filing date | 13163155.8 | 27.09.2006 | [2013/47] | Priority number, date | US20050720760P | 27.09.2005 Original published format: US 720760 P | [2013/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2664337 | Date: | 20.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2664337 | Date: | 14.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/12, C07K14/47, C07K14/78, A61K35/50, A61K38/17, A61K38/39, A61K38/48, A61K35/48, C07K14/81 | [2013/47] | CPC: |
A61K35/50 (EP,US);
A61K31/738 (EP,US);
A61K35/48 (EP,US);
A61K38/1709 (EP,US);
A61K38/39 (EP,US);
A61K38/4886 (EP,US);
A61K8/982 (US);
A61K9/0014 (US);
A61K9/0048 (US);
A61K9/0053 (US);
A61K9/06 (US);
A61K9/08 (US);
A61K9/19 (US);
A61L15/40 (US);
A61L15/44 (US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (US);
C07K14/4702 (EP,US);
C07K14/4718 (EP,US);
C07K14/78 (EP,US);
C07K14/8114 (EP,US);
A61K2800/74 (US);
A61L2300/412 (US);
A61L2300/64 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K38/1709, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K38/39, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K38/4886, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/33] |
Former [2013/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Amnion-Zubereitungen und gereinigte Zusammensetzungen und Anwendungsverfahren | [2013/47] | English: | Amniotic membrane preparations and purified compositions and methods of use | [2013/47] | French: | Preparations de membrane amniotique et compositions purifiees, et procedes d'utilisation | [2013/47] | Examination procedure | 20.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/26] | 13.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06804232.4 / EP1933852 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060804232) is 04.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 13.01.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 13.01.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.01.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.09.2006 | AT | 14.08.2019 | CY | 14.08.2019 | CZ | 14.08.2019 | DK | 14.08.2019 | EE | 14.08.2019 | ES | 14.08.2019 | FI | 14.08.2019 | IT | 14.08.2019 | LT | 14.08.2019 | LV | 14.08.2019 | MC | 14.08.2019 | NL | 14.08.2019 | PL | 14.08.2019 | RO | 14.08.2019 | SE | 14.08.2019 | SI | 14.08.2019 | SK | 14.08.2019 | TR | 14.08.2019 | IE | 27.09.2019 | LU | 27.09.2019 | BE | 30.09.2019 | CH | 30.09.2019 | LI | 30.09.2019 | FR | 14.10.2019 | BG | 14.11.2019 | GB | 14.11.2019 | GR | 15.11.2019 | IS | 14.12.2019 | PT | 16.12.2019 | DE | 01.04.2020 | [2021/33] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 14.08.2019 | |
CY | 14.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IE | 27.09.2019 | ||
LU | 27.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
FR | 14.10.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
GB | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
DE | 01.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AT | 14.08.2019 | |
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IE | 27.09.2019 | ||
LU | 27.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
FR | 14.10.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
GB | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
DE | 01.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AT | 14.08.2019 | |
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IE | 27.09.2019 | ||
LU | 27.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
DE | 01.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 14.08.2019 | |
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IE | 27.09.2019 | ||
LU | 27.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
DE | 01.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AT | 14.08.2019 | |
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LU | 27.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
DE | 01.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AT | 14.08.2019 | |
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
DE | 01.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AT | 14.08.2019 | |
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 14.08.2019 | |
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 14.08.2019 | |
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 14.08.2019 | |
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
IT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | DK | 14.08.2019 | |
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | ES | 14.08.2019 | |
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | ES | 14.08.2019 | |
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 14.08.2019 | |
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 14.08.2019 | |
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 14.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5192744 (BOUCK NOEL P [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * claim 1 * * column 5, line 65 - column 6, line 9 *; | [A]US6152142 (TSENG SCHEFFER C G [US]) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 39 - line 42 *; | [X]WO03077794 (TISSUETECH INC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0113] * * paragraph [0114] *; | [X]US2004057938 (GHINELLI EMILIANO [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * claim 14 * * paragraph [0007] *; | [A]WO2005060988 (DEFIANTE FARMACEUTICA LDA [PT], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** claims 7-12 *; | [XP]WO2006094247 (TISSUETECH INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0048] * * claim 15 *; | [XD] - NA ET AL, "Analysis of human amniotic membrane components as proteinase inhibitors for development of therapeutic agent for recalcitrant keratitis", PLACENTA, W.B. SAUNDERS, GB, (19990101), vol. 20, doi:10.1016/S0143-4004(99)80034-4, ISSN 0143-4004, pages 453 - 466, XP005419091 [XD] 1-15 * page 454 * * page 463 - page 464 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0143-4004(99)80034-4 | [AP] - DAY ET AL, "Hyaluronan cross-linking: a protective mechanism in inflammation?", TRENDS IN IMMUNOLOGY, ELSEVIER, RAHWAY, NJ, US LNKD- DOI:10.1016/J.IT.2005.09.009, (20051201), vol. 26, no. 12, ISSN 1471-4906, pages 637 - 643, XP005172384 [AP] 1-15 * page 640 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.it.2005.09.009 | Examination | - K. Temma ET AL, "Effects of 4-hydroxy-2-nonenal, a marker of oxidative stress, on the cyclooxygenase-2 of human placenta in chorioamnionitis", Molecular Human Reproduction, (20040101), vol. 10, no. 3, doi:10.1093/molehr/gah030, pages 167 - 171, XP055315804 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/molehr/gah030 | - N. Ahmed, "Expression and localization of v 6 integrin in extraplacental fetal membranes: possible role in human parturition", MOLECULAR HUMAN REPRODUCTION., GB - BE, (20040129), vol. 10, no. 3, doi:10.1093/molehr/gah025, ISSN 1360-9947, pages 173 - 179, XP055315815 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/molehr/gah025 | by applicant | US3598122 | US3598123 | US3710795 | US3731683 | US3742951 | US3814097 | US3921636 | US3972995 | US3993072 | US3993073 | US3996934 | US4031894 | US4060084 | US4069307 | US4077407 | US4201211 | US4230105 | US4292299 | US4292303 | US4327725 | US4476116 | US4624848 | US4871549 | US4968509 | US5011692 | US5017381 | US5033252 | US5052558 | US5116817 | US5229135 | US5260068 | US5260069 | US5323907 | US5336168 | US5456923 | US5461140 | US5508040 | US5516527 | US5567441 | US5622721 | US5665378 | US5686105 | US5700410 | US5837280 | US5837284 | US5840329 | US5869090 | US5977175 | US6391452 | US6465014 | US6923983 | US6929801 | US6932983 | US6946144 | - HEILIGENHAUS ET AL., INVEST OPHTHALMOL VIS SCI., (2001), vol. 42, pages 1969 - 1974 | - LEE; TSENG, AM J OPHTHALMOL., (1997), vol. 123, pages 303 - 312 | - PRABHASAWAT ET AL., OPHTHALMOLOGY, (1997), vol. 104, pages 974 - 985 | - TSENG ET AL., ARCH OPHTHALMOL., (1998), vol. 116, pages 431 - 441 | - Molecular Cloning: A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (2001), vol. 1-3 | - LIBERMAN ET AL., Pharmaceutical Dosage Forms, (1990), vol. 1, pages 209 - 214 | - SINGH ET AL., Encyclopedia of Pharmaceutical Technology, (2002), pages 751 - 753 | - BORDER ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (1992), vol. 90, pages 1 - 7 | - GRANDE, PROC. SOC. EXP. BIOL. MED., (1997), vol. 214, pages 27 - 40 | - JESTER ET AL., PROG. RETIN. EYE RES., (1999), vol. 18, no. 3, pages 311 - 356 | - MAREK ET AL., MED. SCI. MONIT., (2002), vol. 8, no. 7, pages RA145 - 151 | - TSENG ET AL., OCULAR SURFACE J., (2004), vol. 2, no. 3, pages 177 - 187 | - RONNOV-JESSEN ET AL., LAB. INVEST., (1993), vol. 68, pages 696 - 707 | - VERBEEK ET AL., AM. J. PATHOL., (1994), vol. 144, pages 372 - 82 | - HALES ET AL., CURR. EYE RES., (1994), vol. 13, pages 885 - 90 | - JESTER ET AL., CORNEA, (1996), vol. 15, pages 505 - 16 | - SERINI ET AL., J. CELL. BIOL., (1998), vol. 142, pages 873 - 81 | - GRANDE, PROC. SOC. EXP. BIOL. MED., (1997), vol. 214, no. 1, pages 27 - 40 | - JESTER ET AL., PROG. RETIN. EYE. RES., (1999), vol. 18, pages 311 - 56 | - LAWRENCE, EUR. CYTOKINE NETW., (1996), vol. 7, pages 363 - 74 | - MASSAGUE ET AL., GENES AND DEVELOPMENT., (2000), vol. 14, pages 627 - 44 | - DERYNCK ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. ACTA., (1997), vol. 1333, pages FI05 - FI50 | - SHAHI ET AL., LANCET, (1992), vol. 339, pages 213 - 214 | - PETROLL ET AL., CURR. EYE RES., (1998), vol. 1739, pages 736 - 747 | - YAMAGUCHI ET AL., NATURE, (1990), vol. 346, no. 6281, pages 281 - 284 | - LOGAN ET AL., EXP. NEUROL., (1999), vol. 159, pages 504 - 510 | - TSENG ET AL., J CELL PHYSIOL., (1999), vol. 179, pages 325 - 335 | - LEE ET AL., CURR. EYE RES., (2000), vol. 20, no. 4, pages 325 - 334 | - FOUTUNATO ET AL., AM. J. OBSTET. GYNECOL., (1996), vol. 175, pages 1057 - 65 | - FOUTUNATO ET AL., AM. J. OBSTET. GYNECOL., (1997), vol. 177, pages 803 - 9 | - FOUTUNATO ET AL., AM. J. OBSTET. GYNECOL., (1998), vol. 179, pages 794 - 9 | - PETRAGLIA ET AL., J. CLIN. ENDOCRINOL. METAB., (1993), vol. 77, pages 542 - 8 | - RILEY ET AL., HUM. REPROD., (2000), vol. 15, pages 578 - 83 | - KEELAN ET AL., PLACENTA, (2000), vol. 31, pages 38 - 43 | - NA ET AL., TROPHOBLAST RES., (1999), vol. 13, pages 459 - 66 | - ROMERO ET AL., AM. J. OBSTET. GYNECOL., (1994), vol. 171, pages 912 - 21 | - LEE H.G.; COWMAN, M. K., "n Agarose Gel Electrophoretic Method for Analysis of Hyaluronan Molecular Weight Distribution", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (1994), vol. 219, pages 278 - 287 | - NOMA ET AL., GROWTH FACTORS, (1991), vol. 4, pages 247 - 255 | - BAE ET AL., J BIOL CHEM., (1995), vol. 270, pages 29460 - 29468 | - CHEN ET AL., J IMMUNOL., (2001), vol. 167, pages 1297 - 1305 | - HE ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1998), vol. 95, pages 2509 - 2514 | - GABBIANI G., J PATHOL., (2003), vol. 200, pages 500 - 503 | - JESTER; PETROLL, PROG RETIN EYE RES., (1999), vol. 18, pages 311 - 356 |