EP2649889 - Oral tobacco product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.2019 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states British American Tobacco (Investments) Limited 1 Water Street London WC2R 3LA / GB | For all designated states Fiedler & Lundgren AB P.O. Box 9041 Stenaldersgatan 23 200 39 Malmo / SE | [2013/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rushforth, David c/o Globe House 1 Water Street London, WC2R 3LA / GB | 02 /
Sommarstrom, Eva c/o Globe House 1 Water Street London, WC2R 3LA / GB | 03 /
Essén, Hans Tomas c/o PO Box 9041 Stenaldergaten 23 20039 Malmo / SE | [2013/42] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/17] | Alcock, David D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2013/42] | Brown, Alexander Edward, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 13163265.5 | 11.04.2013 | [2013/42] | Priority number, date | GB20120006402 | 11.04.2012 Original published format: GB 201206402 | [2013/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2649889 | Date: | 16.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2649889 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A24B13/00, A24B15/14, A24B3/14 | [2014/13] | CPC: |
A24B15/14 (EP,GB,US);
A24B3/14 (GB);
A24B13/00 (EP,GB,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/42] | A24B13/00, A24B15/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Orales Tabakprodukt | [2013/42] | English: | Oral tobacco product | [2013/42] | French: | Produit de tabac oral | [2013/42] | Examination procedure | 13.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/14] | 03.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/12] | 14.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.06.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US3894544 (EGRI LASZLO); | [X]US4083371 (BERINGER MONIQUE, et al); | [X]GB1570024 (TAMAG BASEL AG); | [X]WO2011130414 (ALTRIA CLIENT SERVICES INC [US], et al) |