EP2792428 - Cooling device with width-dependent cooling effect [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.09.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.10.2015 [2015/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens VAI Metals Technologies GmbH Turmstrasse 44 4031 Linz / AT | [2014/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ehgartner, Sieglinde Semmelweissstraße 60 4020 Linz / AT | 02 /
Chen, Jian Schmiedestrasse 8 4502 St. Marien / AT | 03 /
Karl, Reinhard Steinbauerweg 8/4 4060 Leonding / AT | 04 /
Opitz, Erich Angergasse 46 7123 Mönchhof / AT | 05 /
Pöschl, Florian Merianweg 28 4040 Linz / AT | 06 /
Seilinger, Alois Haselgrabenweg 17 4040 Linz / AT | [2014/43] | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/43] | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13163666.4 | 15.04.2013 | [2014/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2792428 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B21B45/02 | [2014/43] | CPC: |
B21B45/0218 (EP,US);
B21B45/02 (RU);
B21B43/00 (US);
B21B45/0233 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kühleinrichtung mit breitenabhängiger Kühlwirkung | [2014/43] | English: | Cooling device with width-dependent cooling effect | [2014/43] | French: | Dispositif de refroidissement avec effet de refroidissement dépendant de la largeur | [2014/43] | Examination procedure | 15.04.2013 | Examination requested [2014/43] | 23.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/44] | 09.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/44] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS51147449 (SUMITOMO METAL IND); | [A]US2002104597 (FRANK WILLIAM R [US], et al) |