EP2792630 - An elevator car and an elevator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.07.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.08.2019 [2019/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONE Corporation Kartanontie 1 00330 Helsinki / FI | [2018/46] |
Former [2014/43] | For all designated states Kone Corporation Kartanontie 1 00330 Helsinki / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kere, Petri c/o KONE Corporation Kartanontie 1 00330 Helsinki / FI | [2014/43] | Representative(s) | Kolster Oy Ab (Salmisaarenaukio 1) P.O. Box 204 00181 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2014/43] | Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 PO Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 13163844.7 | 16.04.2013 | [2014/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2792630 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B66B11/02 | [2014/43] | CPC: |
B66B11/0206 (EP,US);
B66B11/0226 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Einer Aufzugskabine und Aufzug | [2014/43] | English: | An elevator car and an elevator | [2014/43] | French: | Cabine d'ascenseur et ascenseur | [2014/43] | Examination procedure | 02.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/43] | 11.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/33] | 27.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.10.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US6209686 (TOMASETTI FABRICE [FR], et al) [Y] 1-5,9-15 * columns 1-4; figures 1-4 * [A] 6-8; | [Y]US5374466 (BLEASDALE DESMOND H [AU]) [Y] 1-15 * column 1, lines 14-20; figures 1,5,6,7 * * column 3, lines 31-55 *; | [YA]US4635756 (SHERWOOD EDWARD F [US], et al) [Y] 6-8 * column 5, line 64 - column 6, line 30; figures 1,3,9 * [A] 1; | [YA]US2005145443 (FRIEDMAN HAROLD S [US], et al) [Y] 10 * paragraphs [0022] - [0024]; figures 6-8 * [A] 1 | by applicant | EP1970341 | WO9933743 |