EP2792606 - Method of assembling a box and box assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/43] | Blank for a box with a marker to indicate authenticity, box, and method of and system for making the blank | ||
[2016/16] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states G.C.L. Giant Consulting Limited 32 Lower Leeson Street Dublin 2 / IE | [2014/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Allen, Martin John c/o G.C.L. Giant Consulting Ltd 10 Clanwilliam Square Dublin 2 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/43] | 01 /
Allen, Martin John 47 Oaklands Drive Rathgar Dublin 6 / IE | Representative(s) | Lamb, Martin John Carstairs Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/43] | Lamb, Martin John Carstairs Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 13163992.4 | 16.04.2013 | [2014/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2792606 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/02, B65D5/42 | [2014/43] | CPC: |
B65D5/0254 (EP);
B65D5/4283 (EP);
B65D2203/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/22] |
Former [2014/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Schachtel und Schachtelbausatz | [2016/16] | English: | Method of assembling a box and box assembly | [2016/16] | French: | Procédé d'assemblage d'une boîte et ensemble de boîte | [2016/16] |
Former [2014/43] | Vorlage für eine Schachtel mit Marker zur Anzeige der Authentizität, Schachtel und Verfahren und System zur Herstellung der Vorlage | ||
Former [2014/43] | Blank for a box with a marker to indicate authenticity, box, and method of and system for making the blank | ||
Former [2014/43] | Ébauche pour une boîte avec un marqueur pour indiquer l'authenticité, boîte, procédé et système de fabrication de l'ébauche | Examination procedure | 07.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/43] | 30.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.10.2015 | 13.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 23.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/09] | 17.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.07.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.06.2015 | 30.04.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE19511962 (EMRICH DIRK [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,6,8,12,15 * column 6, line 62 - column 7, line 7; figures 1-3; claim 1 * [A] 9-11,13,14; | [XA]WO9912818 (EIKON GRAFICHE SRL [IT]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,12,15 * page 2, line 16 - page 4, line 19; figures 1-3 * [A] 9,11,13,14; | [X]DE202004006327U (HEISEL CLAUDIA [DE]) [X] 1,3,7,9,10,13,14 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0022]; figures 1-4 *; | [X]BE480240 (BERGHGRACHT M) [X] 1,11,12 * page 3, paragraphs 2-6; figures 1-6; claims 1-3 *; | [A]US2007085335 (LAMPE SCOTT A [US]) [A] 1,9,13,14 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0035]; figures 1-5 * | by applicant | US5375722 |