EP2793205 - Onboard installation for a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kapsch TrafficCom AG Am Europlatz 2 1120 Wien / AT | [2014/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Povolny, Robert Nußdorfer Lände 39 1190 Wien / AT | 02 /
Nagy, Oliver Leopold Steiner Gasse 48 1190 Wien / AT | [2014/43] | Representative(s) | Weiser, Andreas, et al Patentanwalt Kopfgasse 7 1130 Wien / AT | [2014/43] | Application number, filing date | 13164397.5 | 19.04.2013 | [2014/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2793205 | Date: | 22.10.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2793205 | Date: | 04.11.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/017, G07B15/06, // H04W4/00 | [2014/43] | CPC: |
H04W4/021 (EP,US);
G01S5/0027 (US);
G06Q20/3278 (US);
G07B15/063 (EP,US);
G08G1/017 (EP,US);
G08G1/149 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/43] | Title | German: | Onboard-Anlage für ein Fahrzeug | [2014/43] | English: | Onboard installation for a vehicle | [2014/43] | French: | Installation embarquée pour un véhicule | [2014/43] | Examination procedure | 02.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/43] | 10.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 05.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.04.2013 | AL | 04.11.2015 | BG | 04.11.2015 | CY | 04.11.2015 | EE | 04.11.2015 | FI | 04.11.2015 | HR | 04.11.2015 | LT | 04.11.2015 | LV | 04.11.2015 | MC | 04.11.2015 | MK | 04.11.2015 | MT | 04.11.2015 | RO | 04.11.2015 | RS | 04.11.2015 | SM | 04.11.2015 | TR | 04.11.2015 | GR | 05.02.2016 | IS | 04.03.2016 | IE | 19.04.2016 | LU | 19.04.2016 | BE | 30.04.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 19.04.2013 | |
BG | 04.11.2015 | ||
CY | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
MK | 04.11.2015 | ||
MT | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
TR | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
IE | 19.04.2016 | ||
LU | 19.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 19.04.2013 | |
BG | 04.11.2015 | ||
CY | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
MK | 04.11.2015 | ||
MT | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
IE | 19.04.2016 | ||
LU | 19.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 19.04.2013 | |
CY | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
MK | 04.11.2015 | ||
MT | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
IE | 19.04.2016 | ||
LU | 19.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 19.04.2013 | |
CY | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
MK | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
IE | 19.04.2016 | ||
LU | 19.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | EE | 04.11.2015 | |
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
IE | 19.04.2016 | ||
LU | 19.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | EE | 04.11.2015 | |
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
LU | 19.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | EE | 04.11.2015 | |
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
SM | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | EE | 04.11.2015 | |
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | FI | 04.11.2015 | |
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 04.11.2015 | |
HR | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 04.11.2015 | |
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
RS | 04.11.2015 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | LT | 04.11.2015 | |
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 04.11.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005285743 (WEBER TORY S [CA]) [X] 14 * paragraphs [0045] - [0070]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2006155430 (BURGESS PATRICK E [US]) [A] 1-13,16,17 * paragraphs [0011] - [0027] *; | [X]WO2010031625 (BUNDESDRUCKEREI GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 15* page 6, line 9 - page 17, line 27; figure 1 *; | [A]US2010148947 (MORGAN GERALD A [US], et al) [A] 1-13,16,17 * paragraphs [0029] - [0037] * |