EP2620900 - Systems and methods for dynamically updating a dispatch plan [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.05.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNITED PARCEL SERVICE OF AMERICA, INC. 55 Glenlake Parkway, N.E. Atlanta, GA 30328 / US | [2013/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Levis, Jack 2775 Chestnut Run Road York, PA 17402-8856 / US | 02 /
Mohr, Douglas K. 201 Terrace View Court Churchville, MD 21028 / US | 03 /
Nuggehalli, Ranganath S. 4 Breton Hill Road 3B Pikesville, MD 21208 / US | 04 /
D'Antona, Anthony J. 2005 Montford Drive Forest Hill, MD 21050 / US | 05 /
Hu, Ping 820 Crystal Palace Court Owings Mills, MD 21117 / US | [2013/31] | Representative(s) | Black, Diego, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/15] | Black, Diego, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | ||
Former [2013/31] | Chettle, Adrian John, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 13164808.1 | 17.04.2006 | [2013/31] | Priority number, date | US20050108994 | 18.04.2005 Original published format: US 108994 | [2013/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2620900 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2620900 | Date: | 16.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00, G06Q99/00, G06Q10/08 | [2013/42] | CPC: |
G06Q10/08 (EP,US);
G06Q10/083 (US)
|
Former IPC [2013/31] | G06Q10/00, G06Q99/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/31] | Title | German: | Systeme und Verfahren zur dynamischen Aktualisierung eines Versendeplans | [2013/31] | English: | Systems and methods for dynamically updating a dispatch plan | [2013/31] | French: | Systèmes et procédés de mise à jour dynamique d'un plan de répartition | [2013/31] | Examination procedure | 23.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/31] | 24.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/25] | 18.12.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/25] | 05.02.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06750394.6 / EP1877978 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO0165523 (GLOBAL RES SYSTEMS INC [US]) [I] 1-12 * abstract * * page 5, line 1 - line 5 * * page 6, line 15 - line 22 * * page 7, line 6 - line 16 * * page 7, line 17 - line 22 * * page 7, line 23 - page 8, line 12 * * page 11, line 24 - page 12, line 18 * * page 12, line 8 - line 18 * * page 12, line 24 - page 13, line 10 * * page 14, line 18 - line 24 * * page 15, line 1 - line 10 * * page 18, line 11 - line 16 *; | [I]GB2368426 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [I] 1-12 * abstract * * page 3, line 24 - line 28 * * page 3, line 34 - page 4, line 10 * * page 4, line 14 - line 24 * * page 6, line 5 - line 25 * * page 7, line 13 - line 20 * * page 7, line 21 - page 8, line 27 * * page 8, line 28 - line 33 * * page 12, line 11 - page 13, line 16 *; | [A]US2002055818 (GASPARD JAMES G [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * figures 3a-3e * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0054] ** paragraph [0058] * | by applicant | EP0829057 | JPH10227147 | US2003114206 | US20020227147 | US20030745468 |