EP2620915 - Three-dimensional scan recovery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/31] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kriveshko, Ilya, A. c/o 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2013/31] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2015/44] |
Former [2013/31] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13164896.6 | 19.01.2007 | [2013/31] | Priority number, date | US20060337182 | 20.01.2006 Original published format: US 337182 | [2013/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2620915 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2620915 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | [2013/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2620915 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00, G06T17/00 | [2015/21] | CPC: |
G06T17/00 (EP,US);
A61C9/0046 (EP,US);
G01B11/24 (EP,US);
G06T7/30 (EP,US);
A61C9/0086 (EP,US);
G06T2200/04 (EP,US);
G06T2200/24 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10016 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10028 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30036 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/35] | G06T7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/44] |
Former [2013/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Wiederaufnahme dreidimensionalen Scannings | [2013/31] | English: | Three-dimensional scan recovery | [2013/31] | French: | Récupération de balayage tridimensionnel | [2013/31] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/16] | 05.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07716744.3 / EP1974325 | Opposition(s) | 29.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.01.2007 | AT | 28.10.2015 | BE | 28.10.2015 | BG | 28.10.2015 | CY | 28.10.2015 | CZ | 28.10.2015 | DK | 28.10.2015 | EE | 28.10.2015 | ES | 28.10.2015 | FI | 28.10.2015 | IT | 28.10.2015 | LT | 28.10.2015 | LV | 28.10.2015 | MC | 28.10.2015 | NL | 28.10.2015 | PL | 28.10.2015 | RO | 28.10.2015 | SE | 28.10.2015 | SI | 28.10.2015 | SK | 28.10.2015 | TR | 28.10.2015 | IE | 19.01.2016 | LU | 19.01.2016 | GB | 28.01.2016 | GR | 29.01.2016 | IS | 28.02.2016 | PT | 29.02.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 19.01.2007 | |
AT | 28.10.2015 | ||
BE | 28.10.2015 | ||
CY | 28.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
TR | 28.10.2015 | ||
IE | 19.01.2016 | ||
LU | 19.01.2016 | ||
GB | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 19.01.2007 | |
AT | 28.10.2015 | ||
BE | 28.10.2015 | ||
CY | 28.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
IE | 19.01.2016 | ||
LU | 19.01.2016 | ||
GB | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
BE | 28.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
IE | 19.01.2016 | ||
LU | 19.01.2016 | ||
GB | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
BE | 28.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
LU | 19.01.2016 | ||
GB | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SI | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
LU | 19.01.2016 | ||
GB | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
LU | 19.01.2016 | ||
GB | 28.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
MC | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
LU | 19.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
DK | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
LU | 19.01.2016 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
EE | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
RO | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
SK | 28.10.2015 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
CZ | 28.10.2015 | ||
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LV | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 28.10.2015 | |
ES | 28.10.2015 | ||
FI | 28.10.2015 | ||
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
PL | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
GR | 29.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
PT | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 28.10.2015 | |
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
SE | 28.10.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 28.10.2015 | |
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
NL | 28.10.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 28.10.2015 | |
IT | 28.10.2015 | ||
LT | 28.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 28.10.2015 | |
LT | 28.10.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6014473 (HOSSACK JOHN A [US], et al); | [A]US6012458 (MO LARRY Y L [US], et al); | [Y]US2004189686 (TANGUAY DONALD O [US], et al); | [XY]US2005069188 (RUBBERT RUDGER [DE], et al); | [A]US2005089213 (GENG Z J [US]) | by applicant | US2004155975 | US20050270135 |