EP2797179 - Inductive disturbance reduction device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2015 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2015 [2015/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2014/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Budzelaar, Frank, P. M. P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Deladis, Szabolcs P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2014/44] | Representative(s) | Gravendeel, Cornelis, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2014/44] | Gravendeel, Cornelis, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 13165037.6 | 24.04.2013 | [2014/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2797179 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/6467, A61B18/18, A61B18/12 | [2014/44] | CPC: |
A61B18/1492 (EP,RU,US);
H01R13/6467 (RU);
A61B2017/00526 (US);
A61B2018/00178 (US);
A61B2090/376 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3784 (EP,US);
H01R2201/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Induktive Störungsreduktionsvorrichtung | [2014/44] | English: | Inductive disturbance reduction device | [2014/44] | French: | Dispositif de réduction de perturbation inductive | [2014/44] | Examination procedure | 24.04.2013 | Examination requested [2014/44] | 30.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/45] | 10.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/45] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO9927627 (INTEL CORP [US], et al); | [A]US5967853 (HASHIM AMID I [US]); | [A]WO2011066445 (MEDWAVES INC [US], et al); | [Y]WO2012087956 (INTEL CORP [US], et al) |